KMG International, BV v. Fun Light Amusements, SRO et al
Plaintiff: KMG International, BV
Defendant: Alan Ferguson, Confolding Group, SRO and Fun Light Amusements, SRO
Case Number: 8:2019cv00333
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Leia Villasenor Leitner on behalf of Confolding Group, SRO, Fun Light Amusements, SRO (Leitner, Leia)
April 4, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Emerson Moats on behalf of Confolding Group, SRO, Fun Light Amusements, SRO (Moats, Matthew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Coleman W. Watson on behalf of Confolding Group, SRO, Fun Light Amusements, SRO (Watson, Coleman)
March 1, 2019 Filing 15 Construed ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Alan Ferguson. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(KMM)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Confolding Group, SRO.(KMM)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER striking #12 Answer to Complaint filed by Fun Light Amusements, SRO, and directing Defendant to obtain counsel within sixty (60) days in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/1/2019. (CCB)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 *** Stricken- per DE# 13 *** ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Fun Light Amusements, SRO. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(AG) Modified text on 3/4/2019 (KMM).
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by KMG International, BV. Related case(s): no (Keller, Richard)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #9 Related case order and track 2 notice by KMG International, BV. (Keller, Richard)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/8/2019. (SAO)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BSN)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Confolding Group, SRO, Alan Ferguson, Fun Light Amusements, SRO. (BSN)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-333-T-02SPF. (SJB)
February 7, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KMG International, BV. (Keller, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KMG International, BV. (Keller, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by KMG International, BV. (Keller, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by KMG International, BV re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Keller, Richard)
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15104584) filed by KMG International, BV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Keller, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KMG International, BV v. Fun Light Amusements, SRO et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Confolding Group, SRO
Represented By: Matthew Emerson Moats
Represented By: Coleman W. Watson
Represented By: Leia Villasenor Leitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fun Light Amusements, SRO
Represented By: Matthew Emerson Moats
Represented By: Coleman W. Watson
Represented By: Leia Villasenor Leitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KMG International, BV
Represented By: Ryon Yemm
Represented By: Richard A. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?