Beachum
Petitioner: Gregory W. Beachum
In Re: 2015 22' Robalo 226 Cayman vessel, FL Registration No. FL3662PT, Its engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in a cause of exoneration from or limitation of liability
Case Number: 8:2019cv00346
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:31301
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MONITION by Deputy Clerk as to 2015 22' Robalo 226 Cayman vessel, FL Registration No. FL3662PT, Its engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in a cause of exoneration from or limitation of liability re #11 Preliminary Injunction (CTR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED document by Gregory W. Beachum. Amended Ad Interim Stipulation for Value. (Pope, David)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 MONITION AND INJUNCTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/22/2019. (DMP)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 STIPULATION by Gregory W. Beachum for costs. (Pope, David)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 motion for order approving ad interim stipulation and issuing monition and injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 2/21/2019. (DMP)
February 15, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Gregory W. Beachum. Related case(s): no (Pope, David)
February 15, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Gregory W. Beachum. (Pope, David)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2019. (BGS)
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/11/2019. (BGS)
February 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Entry of Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing Monition and Injunction by Gregory W. Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Approving Ad Interim Stipulation and Issuing of Monition and Injunction, #2 Text of Proposed Order Monition and Injunction)(Pope, David)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to Claimants of Petition for Exoneration from or Limitation of Liability by Gregory W. Beachum (CTR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 AD INTERIM STIPULATION FOR COSTS AND VALUE by Gregory W. Beachum. (CTR)
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055209 ) filed by Gregory W. Beachum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beachum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory W. Beachum
Represented By: David F. Pope
Represented By: Eric C. Thiel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: 2015 22' Robalo 226 Cayman vessel, FL Registration No. FL3662PT, Its engines, tackle, apparel, etc., in a cause of exoneration from or limitation of liability
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?