Centennial Bank v. Horus Construction Services, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Centennial Bank, an Arkansas state chartered bank, successor by merger with Stonegate Bank and Centenial Bank
Defendant: Horus Construction Services, Inc., a Florida corporation, Jonathan D. Graham and Horus Construction Services, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00415
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Jonathan D. Graham, Horus Construction Services, Inc..(Quinn, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on March 14, 2019 by Centenial Bank as to Jonathan D. Graham. (Anthony, Stephenie)
March 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Hardy L. Roberts, III on behalf of Horus Construction Services, Inc. (Roberts, Hardy)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #13 Defendant Horus Construction Services, Inc's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including April 2, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/14/2019. (GMD)
March 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Horus Construction Services, Inc.. (Quinn, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Quinn on behalf of Horus Construction Services, Inc. (Quinn, Michael)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Centenial Bank identifying Corporate Parent Home BancShares, Inc. for Centenial Bank.. (Anthony, Stephenie)
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Centenial Bank. Related case(s): No (Anthony, Stephenie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on February 20, 2019 by Centenial Bank as to Horus Construction Services, Inc.. (Anthony, Stephenie)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/5/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/19/2019. (KTT)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/5/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 2/19/2019. (KTT)
February 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Jonathan D. Graham, Horus Construction Services, Inc. (LD)
February 15, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Centennial Bank, an Arkansas state chartered bank, successor by merger with Stonegate Bank. (Anthony, Stephenie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Centennial Bank, an Arkansas state chartered bank, successor by merger with Stonegate Bank. (Anthony, Stephenie)
February 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Centennial Bank of filing Civil Cover Sheet (Anthony, Stephenie) Modified on 2/19/2019 (LD).
February 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-415-T-35SPF. (SJB)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Jonathan D. Graham, Horus Construction Services, Inc., (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15139685) filed by Centennial Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Promissory Note, #2 Exhibit Business Loan Agreement, #3 Exhibit Commercial Security Agreement, #4 Exhibit Commercial Guaranty, #5 Exhibit UCC, #6 Exhibit Demand letter)(Anthony, Stephenie) Modified on 2/19/2019 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Centennial Bank v. Horus Construction Services, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horus Construction Services, Inc., a Florida corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D. Graham
Represented By: Michael P. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horus Construction Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michael P. Quinn
Represented By: Hardy L. Roberts, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centennial Bank, an Arkansas state chartered bank, successor by merger with Stonegate Bank
Represented By: Stephenie Biernacki Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centenial Bank
Represented By: Stephenie Biernacki Anthony
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?