Jones v. The Mosaic Company

Plaintiff: Deron Jones
Defendant: The Mosaic Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00418
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Natasha Tala Khoyi on behalf of The Mosaic Company (Khoyi, Natasha)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by The Mosaic Company. Related case(s): no (Carlstedt, Edward)
March 28, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by The Mosaic Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Defendant's Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses)(Carlstedt, Edward) Modified text on 3/28/2019 (BSN).
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 03/08/2019 by Deron Jones as to The Mosaic Company. (Leib, Leighton)
February 20, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 2/20/2019. (AC)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to The Mosaic Company. (BSN)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-418-T-30TGW. (SJB)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Mosaic Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15140317) filed by Deron Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Leib, Leighton) Modified text on 2/19/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. The Mosaic Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Mosaic Company
Represented By: Natasha Tala Khoyi
Represented By: Edward B. Carlstedt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deron Jones
Represented By: Leighton Leib
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?