Johnson v. Trump
Plaintiff: Alva Johnson
Defendant: Donald J. Trump and Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00475
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of compliance re 25 Order by Alva Johnson (Varnell, Janet)
April 8, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of compliance re 24 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Harder, Charles)
March 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Charles J. Harder, appearing on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055906.) Related document: #23 Unopposed MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER directing Attorneys Jennifer Bennett, Paul Bland, and Karla Gilbride to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing. It appears that you are not registered for CM/ECF access. Accordingly, the Court directs counsel to register for CM/ECF access by April 9, 2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/26/2019. (SAO)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Charles J. Harder may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants, with Attorneys Dawn Siler-Nixon and Tracey K. Jaensch designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/22/2019. (NCR)
March 21, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Charles J. Harder to appear pro hac vice by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint on or before 5/10/2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/15/2019. (CCB)
March 15, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Donald J. Trump For President, Inc (Siler-Nixon, Dawn) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 15, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Hassan A. Zavareei, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055707.) Related document: #6 MOTION for Hassan A. Zavareei to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 15, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey K. Jaensch on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Jaensch, Tracey)
March 15, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Dawn Siler-Nixon on behalf of Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump (Siler-Nixon, Dawn)
March 13, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 3 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Alva Johnson. Related case(s): n (Varnell, Janet)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Alva Johnson. (Varnell, Janet)
March 11, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER of service returned executed on 3/11/2019 by Alva Johnson as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc., Donald J. Trump. (Aizpuru, Katherine)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jennifer Bennett, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055636.) Related document: #10 MOTION for Jennifer Bennett to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Frank Paul Bland Jr, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055636.) Related document: #14 MOTION for F. Paul Bland to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Karla Gilbride, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055635.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Karla Gilbride to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Tanya S. Koshy, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055604.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Tanya S. Koshy to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER granting #14 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney F. Paul Bland may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Janet R. Varnell designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/8/2019. (NCR)
March 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for F. Paul Bland to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Jennifer Bennett and Karla Gilbride may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Janet R. Varnell designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/6/2019. (NCR)
March 6, 2019 Filing 12 PROOF of service by Alva Johnson (Varnell, Janet)
March 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Karla Gilbride to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Jennifer Bennett to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
March 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Katherine M. Aizpuru, appearing on behalf of Alva Johnson (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055527.) Related document: #7 MOTION for KATHERINE M. AIZPURU to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 #7 #8 motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Tanya S. Koshy, Katherine M. Alzpuru, and Hassan A. Zavareei may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiff, with Attorney Janet R. Varnell designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 3/1/2019. (NCR)
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Tanya S. Koshy to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for KATHERINE M. AIZPURU to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for HASSAN A. ZAVAREEI to appear pro hac vice by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Varnell, Janet) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 3. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/27/2019. (SAO)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Donald J. Trump For President, Inc, Donald J. Trump. (BES)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 2/26/2019. (SAO)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-475-T-02SPF. (SJB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Donald J. Trump with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15163943) filed by Alva Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Varnell, Janet)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Trump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump
Represented By: Dawn Siler-Nixon
Represented By: Charles J. Harder
Represented By: Tracey K. Jaensch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald J. Trump For President, Inc.
Represented By: Dawn Siler-Nixon
Represented By: Charles J. Harder
Represented By: Tracey K. Jaensch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alva Johnson
Represented By: Janet R. Varnell
Represented By: Katherine M. Aizpuru
Represented By: Frank Paul Bland
Represented By: Tanya S. Koshy
Represented By: Hassan A. Zavareei
Represented By: Karla Gilbride
Represented By: Jennifer D. Bennett
Represented By: Brian W. Warwick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?