WB Music Corp. et al v. The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C. et al
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Great Hooks Music, Hunterboro Music, WB Music Corp. and Goo Eyed Music
Defendant: Adam Itzkowitz and The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00478
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 60 DAY ORDER dismissing case. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/26/2019. (BGS)
March 26, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of settlement Tentative by But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Goo Eyed Music, Great Hooks Music, Hunterboro Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Renstrom, Laura)
March 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Beard Renstrom on behalf of But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Goo Eyed Music, Great Hooks Music, Hunterboro Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. (Renstrom, Laura)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Defendants' Motion to Extend the Deadline to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants' answer or response due on or before 4/16/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 3/26/2019. (AHA)
March 26, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by All Defendants. (Stanton, Thomas) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
March 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Herbert Stanton on behalf of Adam Itzkowitz, The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C. (Stanton, Thomas)
March 14, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 03/05/19 by Great Hooks Music, WB Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Hunterboro Music, Goo Eyed Music as to The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C. (Page, Frederick) Modified on 3/14/2019 (DG).
March 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 03/05/19 by Great Hooks Music, WB Music Corp., Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Hunterboro Music, Goo Eyed Music as to Adam Itzkowitz. (Page, Frederick)
March 11, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by But Father I Just Want to Sing Music, Goo Eyed Music, Great Hooks Music, Hunterboro Music, Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc., WB Music Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Universal Music Group Inc., Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp., Corporate Parent Vivendi SA for Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc. (Page, Frederick) Modified on 3/12/2019 (DG).
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Complaint, #2 Exhibit- Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (DG)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Adam Itzkowitz, The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C. (DG)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/25/2019. (BGS)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/11/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 2/25/2019. (BGS)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-478-T-36CPT. (SJB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15165216) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Schedule A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summonses)(Page, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WB Music Corp. et al v. The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Universal Polygram International Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: But Father I Just Want to Sing Music
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great Hooks Music
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hunterboro Music
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WB Music Corp.
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goo Eyed Music
Represented By: Frederick Dyer Page
Represented By: Laura Beard Renstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Itzkowitz
Represented By: Thomas Herbert Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Social Kitchen Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Thomas Herbert Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?