Statton v. Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission et al
Plaintiff: Joshua Statton
Defendant: Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission and Carlos Lopez-Cantera
Case Number: 8:2019cv00485
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant Carlos Lopez-Cantera's Motion to Dismiss (Doc. #7 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff Joshua Statton's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply (Doc. #11 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Statton's Complaint (Doc. #1 ) is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/22/2019. (DLB)
April 7, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to file Sur-Reply by Joshua Statton. (Statton, Joshua)
April 5, 2019 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action with Prejudice : Defendant Carlos Lopez Cantera's Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss filed by Carlos Lopez-Cantera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Collins, Leonard)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Defendant Carlos Lopez-Cantera is directed to reply to Plaintiff Joshua Statton's response (Doc. #8 ) by April 8, 2019, as provided herein. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/1/2019. (DLB)
March 31, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action with Prejudice filed by Joshua Statton. (Statton, Joshua)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to State a Cause of Action with Prejudice by Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission, Carlos Lopez-Cantera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Collins, Leonard)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 3/6/2019. (TWL)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Joshua Statton re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Quo Warranto, #2 Exhibit 2: Affidavit of Non-service)(Statton, Joshua)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Pro se Plaintiff Joshua Statton's Motion for Permission to E-File (Doc. #3 ) is GRANTED. Statton is directed to register for a CM/ECF account (login and password) with the assistance of the Clerk's Office as detailed herein. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 2/27/2019. (DLB)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically permission to e-file by Joshua Statton. (JCG)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission, Carlos Lopez-Cantera. (JCG)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission, Carlos Lopez-Cantera Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA055441 filed by Joshua Statton. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Statton v. Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Federal Judicial Nominating Commission
Represented By: Leonard Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos Lopez-Cantera
Represented By: Leonard Michael Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Statton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?