K&S Patching, Inc. v. Aegis Security Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: United States of America and K&S Patching, Inc.
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America and Aegis Security Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv00497
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/22/2019. (APF)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION of Dismissal and Notice of Settlement by K&S Patching, Inc., United States of America. (Maranges, Matthew)
April 4, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by K&S Patching, Inc., United States of America. Related case(s): no (Maranges, Matthew)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 3/12/19 by K&S Patching, Inc., United States of America as to Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (Maranges, Matthew) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (LNR).
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 RETURN of service executed on 3/6/19 by K&S Patching, Inc., United States of America as to Aegis Insurance Company. (Maranges, Matthew) Modified text on 4/1/2019 (LNR).
March 29, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service by K&S Patching, Inc., United States of America re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice, #5 Interested persons order . (Maranges, Matthew)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #8 Aegis Security Insurance Company's Motion for Enlargement of Time. Defendant Aegis Security Insurance Company shall have up to and including April 17, 2019 to file its answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/28/2019. (APF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint. Aegis Security Company's Motion for Enlargement of Time by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Taylor, Timothy)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Shane Taylor on behalf of Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Taylor, Timothy)
March 25, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by K&S Patching, Inc., United States of America identifying Other Affiliate K&S Patching, Inc., Other Affiliate Andy Justo, Other Affiliate Yohel Sanchez, Other Affiliate Peterson, Baldor & Maranges, PLLC for K&S Patching, Inc. (Maranges, Matthew)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/11/2019. (KTT)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 3/11/2019. (KTT)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America. (LNR)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-497-T-35CPT. (SJB)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15173914) filed by K&S Patching, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons)(Maranges, Matthew) Modified text on 2/27/2019 (LNR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K&S Patching, Inc. v. Aegis Security Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Timothy Shane Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew Maranges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K&S Patching, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Maranges
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?