Rumfish Y Vino Corporation et al v. Fortune Hotels, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RUMFISH Y VINO CORPORATION and JPL PARTNERS #1 LP
Defendant: RIA-SANDPIPER, INC., DOES 1-10, TRADEWINDS ISLAND RESORT, Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc. and Resort Inns of America, Inc. a Florida Corporation doing business as Tradewinds Island Resorts
Not Classified By Court: Matulis Law & Mediation
Case Number: 8:2019cv00595
Filed: March 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER dismissing case, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/14/2020. (BGS)
May 13, 2020 Filing 72 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc. (Martin, Joshua) Modified on 5/14/2020 (DG).
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ENDORSED ORDER granting #70 Motion to Continue. The deadline to file a stipulated dismissal is extended to and including May 13, 2020. Absent exigent circumstances, it is unlikely that any further extensions will be granted. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/13/2020. (CEH)
April 13, 2020 Filing 70 MOTION to Continue Dismissal With Prejudice for Another 30 Days by Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. (Boehner, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ENDORSED ORDER granting #68 Motion to Continue. The deadline for the parties to file a stipulated dismissal is extended to and including April 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/12/2020. (CEH)
March 11, 2020 Filing 68 MOTION to Continue Dismissal for an Additional 30 Days by Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. (Boehner, Jacob) Modified on 3/12/2020 (DG).
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 60 DAY ORDER dismissing case. After that 60-day period, however, dismissal shall be with prejudice. Any pending motions are denied as moot and the Clerk is directed to terminate all deadlines and administratively close the file. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 1/13/2020. (BGS)
January 9, 2020 Filing 66 NOTICE of settlement In Principle by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation (Boehner, Jacob)
August 7, 2019 Filing 65 MEDIATION report Hearing held on August 6, 2019. Hearing outcome: This case has reached an impasse. (Matulis, James) Modified on 8/7/2019 (DG).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER: 1. Plaintiffs' Objections #55 are OVERRULED. 2. The Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge #51 is ADOPTED, CONFIRMED, AND APPROVED in all respects and is made a part of this Order for all purposes, including appellate review. 3. Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction #17 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/31/2019. (SG)
June 18, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE of Mediator's Appearance by James Michael Matulis on behalf of Matulis Law & Mediation (Matulis, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on August 6, 2019, 10AM before James Matulis. (DiNardo, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 61 RESPONSE to objections to #51 Report and Recommendations filed by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc. (Martin, Joshua) Modified on 5/24/2019 (DG).
May 23, 2019 Filing 60 REPLY to #52 Counterclaim by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. Related document: #52 Answer to ComplaintCounterclaim filed by Ria-Sandpiper, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Fortune Hotels, Inc.(DiNardo, Michael) Modified on 5/24/2019 (DG).
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/10/2020, Dispositive motions due by 2/7/2020, Pretrial statement due by 5/19/2020, All other motions due by 5/26/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/16/2020 at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Jury Trial set for term commencing 7/6/2020 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/31/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/23/2019. (BGS)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ENDORSED ORDER granting #57 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendants' responses due on or before 5/24/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/20/2019. (JMF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 57 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #55 Objection by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 14, 2019 Filing 56 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (DiNardo, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Filing 55 OBJECTION re #51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. . (DiNardo, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ENDORSED ORDER granting #53 Motion. The parties may telephonically conduct their case management conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/7/2019. (JMF)
May 6, 2019 Filing 53 Joint MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically to Allow Counsel for Plaintiffs and Defendants to Conduct Case Management Conference Telephonically by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua)
May 2, 2019 Filing 52 Defendants' ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM to Plaintiffs' Complaint against JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation by Ria-Sandpiper, Inc., Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Consent and Settlement Agreement)(Martin, Joshua)
April 24, 2019 Filing 51 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/24/2019. (VIV)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ENDORSED ORDER granting #49 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Defendants shall file an answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint no later than May 2, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/24/2019. (Porcelli, Anthony)
April 22, 2019 Filing 49 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 18, 2019 Filing 47 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli: MOTION HEARING held on 4/18/2019 re #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. (digital) Court Reporter: Bill Jones (LV)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER denying #44 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/15/2019. (JMF)
April 14, 2019 Filing 45 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #44 Motion for Leave to file document filed by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc. (Martin, Joshua)
April 12, 2019 Filing 44 MOTION for leave to file Reply by All Plaintiffs. (Silverstein, Murray)
April 11, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of compliance re 22 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation (DiNardo, Michael)
April 9, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Motion Hearing previously scheduled for 4/11/2019 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Motion Hearing set for 4/18/2019 at 02:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (JMF)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ENDORSED ORDER granting #40 Motion to Continue. The hearing will be rescheduled by separate notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/9/2019. (JMF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 40 Unopposed MOTION to Continue April 11, 2019, Hearing by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. (Silverstein, Murray)
April 4, 2019 Filing 39 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #17 Motion for preliminary injunction filed by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Declaration of Keith Overton, #2 Exhibit A, Email Chain dated February 26, 2013, #3 Exhibit B, ICANN WHOIS Page for rumfishgrill.com, #4 Exhibit C, RumFish Grill Advertising Samples, #5 Exhibit D, RumFish Grill Facebook Page, #6 Exhibit E, Tampa Bay Newswire Article dated April 3, 2014, #7 Exhibit F, Tampa Bay Business Journal Article dated May 16, 2014, #8 Exhibit 2, Declaration of James David Johnson, #9 Exhibit G, Rumfish Y Vino USPTO Specimen, #10 Exhibit H, Johnson's Letter dated May 1, 2014, #11 Exhibit I, Redline Comparison of Consent Agreement Between Version 2 and Version 3, #12 Exhibit J, Redline Comparison of Consent Agreement Between Version 3 and Version 4, #13 Exhibit K, Sausser Email Correspondence dated May 21, 2014, #14 Exhibit L, California Corporate Screen for JPL Partners #1, L.P., #15 Exhibit M, ICANN WHOIS Page for rumfishyvinoventura.com, #16 Exhibit 3, Executed Consent Agreement)(Martin, Joshua)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ENDORSED ORDER granting #37 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/4/2019. (JMF)
April 4, 2019 Filing 37 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ENDORSED ORDER granting #35 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Fortune Hotels, Inc. answer or response due 4/25/2019; Resort Inns of America, Inc. answer or response due 4/25/2019; Ria-Sandpiper, Inc. answer or response due 4/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/2/2019. (JMF)
April 2, 2019 Filing 35 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint or Otherwise Respond by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction. Responses due on or before 4/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/1/2019. (JMF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 33 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 28, 2019 Filing 32 RETURN of service executed on 3/14/19 by Rumfish Y Vino Corporation, JPL Partners #1 LP as to Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Silverstein, Murray)
March 28, 2019 Filing 31 RETURN of service executed on 3/14/19 by Rumfish Y Vino Corporation, JPL Partners #1 LP as to Resort Inns of America, Inc.. (Silverstein, Murray)
March 28, 2019 Filing 30 RETURN of service executed on 3/14/19 by Rumfish Y Vino Corporation, JPL Partners #1 LP as to Fortune Hotels, Inc.. (Silverstein, Murray)
March 27, 2019 Filing 29 PROOF of service by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation (Silverstein, Murray) Counsel notified by telephone on 3/28/19 that item is to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated due to the filing of #32. Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG). Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG).
March 27, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF of service by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation (Silverstein, Murray) Counsel notified by telephone on 3/28/19 that item is to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated due to the filing of #31. Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG). Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG).
March 27, 2019 Filing 27 PROOF of service by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation (Silverstein, Murray) Counsel notified by telephone on 3/28/19 that item is to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated due to the filing of #30. Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG). Modified on 3/28/2019 (DG).
March 26, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Michael A. Dinardo (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA055862.) Related document: #21 Unopposed MOTION for Michael A. DiNardo to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
March 25, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. Related case(s): no (Silverstein, Murray)
March 25, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. (Silverstein, Murray)
March 22, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Martin, Joshua)
March 22, 2019 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #7 Interested persons order by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua)
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Michael A. DiNardo may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Attorney Murray B. Silverstein designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/21/2019.(JMF)
March 21, 2019 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Michael A. DiNardo to appear pro hac vice by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. (Silverstein, Murray) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 20, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction. Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. (JMF)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. An #17 amended motion has been filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/20/2019. (JMF)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Referring Motion for Report and Recommendation: #17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/20/2019. (BGS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 19, 2019 Filing 17 Amended MOTION for preliminary injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Michael A. DiNardo)(Silverstein, Murray)
March 18, 2019 Filing 16 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Complaint, #2 Exhibit - Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit - Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit - Exhibit C) (DG)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #3 MOTION for preliminary injunction: Motion Hearing set for 4/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 A before Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 3/15/2019. (JMF)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Referring Motion for Report and Recommendation: #3 MOTION for preliminary injunction filed by JPL Partners #1 LP, Rumfish Y Vino Corporation Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/13/2019. (BGS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #11 Defendants' Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Ex-Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order or, in the Alternative, to Allow Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law. The motion for temporary restraining order has been denied. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/13/2019. (BGS)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #2 Plaintiffs' Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/13/2019. (BGS)
March 12, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Strike #2 MOTION for temporary restraining order or, in the Alternative, to Allow Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiffs' Motion and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc.. (Martin, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
March 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Martin on behalf of Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc. (Martin, Joshua)
March 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05(e): The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
March 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued as to Does 1-10, Fortune Hotels, Inc., Resort Inns of America, Inc., Ria-Sandpiper, Inc. (CTR)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/11/2019. (BGS)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 3/25/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/11/2019. (BGS)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-595-T-36AEP. (SJB)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by JPL PARTNERS #1 LP, RUMFISH Y VINO CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Silverstein, Murray)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for preliminary injunction by All Plaintiffs. (Silverstein, Murray)
March 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for temporary restraining order by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum In Support of Motion for TRO and Preliminary Injunction, #2 Declaration of Pamela Solomon, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit N, #12 Exhibit O, #13 Exhibit P, #14 Exhibit Q, #15 Exhibit R, #16 Exhibit S, #17 Exhibit T, #18 Exhibit U, #19 Exhibit V, #20 Declaration of Michael DiNardo, #21 Exhibit I, #22 Exhibit J, #23 Exhibit K, #24 Exhibit L, #25 Exhibit M)(Silverstein, Murray) .
March 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15218818) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Silverstein, Murray)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rumfish Y Vino Corporation et al v. Fortune Hotels, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RIA-SANDPIPER, INC.
Represented By: Joshua D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRADEWINDS ISLAND RESORT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fortune Hotels, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resort Inns of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resort Inns of America, Inc. a Florida Corporation doing business as Tradewinds Island Resorts
Represented By: Joshua D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RUMFISH Y VINO CORPORATION
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Represented By: Michael DiNardo
Represented By: Jacob Lawrence Boehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JPL PARTNERS #1 LP
Represented By: Murray B. Silverstein
Represented By: Michael DiNardo
Represented By: Jacob Lawrence Boehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Matulis Law & Mediation
Represented By: James Michael Matulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?