Matthews v. Bell et al
Case Number: 8:2019cv00615
Filed: March 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Office: Tampa Office
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2019 Filing 23 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 3/12/2019. (AC)
March 12, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE to counsel David K. Houof Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (JNB)
March 12, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE to counsel of new case number and judge assignment 8:19-cv-615-T-30AAS (signed by deputy clerk). (JNB)
March 12, 2019 Filing 20 Case transferred in from District of New York Western; Case Number 6:18-cv-06460. File received electronically
March 11, 2019 Filing 19 DECISION AND ORDER denying #14 Motion to Strike; granting #7 Motion to Change Venue; deferring ruling on #7 Motion to Dismiss. The matter is transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). The Court leaves consideration of the merits of Plaintiff's Complaint to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk of Court is directed to effectuate the transfer of this matter to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida upon entry of this Decision and Order. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 03/11/2019. (CDH) (A copy of this Decision and Order was mailed to Plaintiff). -CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
March 4, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elaine C. Matthews (updated plaintiff's address) (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
December 20, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of Change of Address by Elaine C. Matthews (updated plaintiff's address) (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to Strike Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion filed by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER re #14 Motion to Strike. Responses are due on or before September 13, 2018. Upon receipt of all papers, the motion will be deemed submitted. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/23/18. (PFC) (A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to Plaintiff) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION to Strike by Elaine C. Matthews. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 envelope)(TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Change Venue MOTION to Dismiss filed by Elaine C. Matthews. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 14, 2018 E-Filing Notification: #7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Change Venue. Added MOTION to Dismiss and modified entry on 8/14/2018 (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION SCHEDULING ORDER Plaintiff must submit any papers in opposition to Defendants' #7 MOTION no later than 9/4/2018. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 8/13/2018. (Copy mailed to plaintiff.) (LB) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell re #8 Declaration, #10 Memorandum in Support, #7 MOTION to Change Venue , #9 Declaration (Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 Declaration, #7 MOTION to Change Venue , #9 Declaration byBrian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell. (Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 9 DECLARATION signed by David K. Hou, Esq. re #7 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell . (Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION signed by Brian A. Bell re #7 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell . (Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
August 13, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss or in the alternative to Change Venue by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell.(Hou, David). Added MOTION to Dismiss on 8/14/2018 (TF). [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
July 6, 2018 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for extension of time. Defendants must answer or otherwise respond to the complaint on or before August 13, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 7/06/18. (PFC) (A copy of this Text Order has been mailed to Plaintiff) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell re #4 Declaration, #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply (Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 4 DECLARATION re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell of David K. Hou, Esq.. (Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
July 5, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell.(Hou, David) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
June 26, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elaine C. Matthews. Brian A. Bell served on 6/21/2018, answer due 7/12/2018; Renee M. Bell served on 6/21/2018, answer due 7/12/2018. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
June 22, 2018 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
June 22, 2018 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. Consent form, privacy notice, pro se assistance program info, civil case timeline and ADR notification given to plaintiff at counter. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Summons Issued as to Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell. (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number ROC010597 (TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]
June 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brian A. Bell, Renee M. Bell, filed by Elaine C. Matthews.(TF) [Transferred from nywd on 3/12/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matthews v. Bell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?