Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Guevara et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Latin Bay Entertainment LLC, Oscar E. Guevara, II, Oscar E. Guevara, II individually and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of Latin Bay Entertainment LLC doing business as Juan Pachanga Nightclub and Latin Bay Entertainment LLC doing business as Juan Pachanga Nightclub
Case Number: 8:2019cv00650
Filed: March 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike #18 Answer to Complaint by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 7, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Oscar E. Guevara, II, Latin Bay Entertainment LLC.(CTR)
May 24, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 5-15-19 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Oscar E. Guevara, II. (Giles, Brian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Oscar E. Guevara, II. (Giles, Brian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS returned unexecuted by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Latin Bay Entertainment LLC. (Giles, Brian)
April 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS issued as to Oscar E. Guevara, II. (DG)
April 27, 2019 Filing 13 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 4/29/2019 (DG).
April 7, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Related case(s): No (Giles, Brian)
April 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
March 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Giles, Brian)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05(e): The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection. (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Oscar E. Guevara, II, Latin Bay Entertainment LLC. (CTR)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/18/2019. (BGS)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 3/18/2019. (BGS)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-650-T-36AAS. (SJB)
March 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
March 16, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
March 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15246809) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Guevara et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin Bay Entertainment LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar E. Guevara, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oscar E. Guevara, II individually and as an officer, director, shareholder, member and/or principal of Latin Bay Entertainment LLC doing business as Juan Pachanga Nightclub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Latin Bay Entertainment LLC doing business as Juan Pachanga Nightclub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?