Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Davidson Prevot, Virginie Saintil, Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC and Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC doing business as Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge
Case Number: 8:2019cv00651
Filed: March 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47 U.S.C. ยง 0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Virginie Saintil (LSS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Davidson Prevot (LSS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC (LSS)
July 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for default Failure to Appear or Answer by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Giles, Brian) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER that a review of the file reveals that Defendants have failed to file a response to the complaint, and Plaintiff has failed to promptly apply to the Clerk for entry of default pursuant to Local Rule 1.07. Therefore, Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE, in writing on or before 7/15/19, why this action should not be dismissed against Defendants for lack of prosecution pursuant to Local Rule 3.10. Failure to respond shall result in this action being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/8/2019. (JD)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 4-11-19 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Virginie Saintil. (Giles, Brian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 4-11-19 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Davidson Prevot. (Giles, Brian)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 4-11-19 by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. as to Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC. (Giles, Brian)
April 27, 2019 Filing 12 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT CODE-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"***PROOF of service by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 4/29/2019 (LSS).
April 27, 2019 Filing 11 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT CODE-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"***PROOF of service by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 4/29/2019 (LSS).
April 27, 2019 Filing 10 ***TERMINATED-INCORRECT EVENT CODE-COUNSEL TO REFILE AS "SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED"***PROOF of service by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Giles, Brian) Modified on 4/29/2019 (LSS).
March 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of filing civil cover sheet re #1 Complaint by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Civil Cover Sheet (Giles, Brian) Linked to complaint on 3/25/2019 (LSS).
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC, Davidson Prevot, Virginie Saintil. (BES)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05 (e): The Clerk is authorized and directed to require a complete and executed AO Form JS44, Civil Cover Sheet, which shall accompany each civil case as a condition to the filing thereof. State and federal prisoners, and other persons filing civil cases pro se are exempt from the requirements of this subsection (BES)
March 18, 2019 Filing 5 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-651-T-24SPF. (SJB)
March 16, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Giles, Brian)
March 16, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Giles, Brian)
March 16, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc (Giles, Brian)
March 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15246812) filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc(Giles, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davidson Prevot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginie Saintil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge LLC doing business as Alez Caribbean Restaurant and Lounge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Brian T. Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?