3Lions Publishing, Inc. v. HIPAA Compliance Services, LLC

Plaintiff: 3Lions Publishing, Inc.
Defendant: HIPAA Compliance Services, LLC, Terry N Talcott and Beyond Wellness, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00663
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:0044
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 10 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #2 Order of Dismissal) (BES)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER: Upon due consideration of the #8 Notice of voluntary dismissal filed by 3Lions Publishing, Inc., this case is dismissed. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions/deadlines and to close the case. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/8/2019. (CCB)
April 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by 3Lions Publishing, Inc. (Leyva, Carlos)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued as to Beyond Wellness, Inc., Terry N Talcott. (BES)
March 29, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Beyond Wellness, Inc, Terry N Talcott with Jury Demand. filed by 3Lions Publishing, Inc. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by 3Lions Publishing, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Summons Beyond Wellness, Inc., #11 Proposed Summons Terry N. Talcott)(Leyva, Carlos)
March 20, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to HIPAA Compliance Services, LLC. (KMM)
March 20, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (KMM)
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 3/20/2019. (SAO)
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-663-T-02SPF. (SJB)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HIPAA Compliance Services, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15253742) filed by 3Lions Publishing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Civil Cover Sheet CS, #11 Proposed Summons Summons)(Leyva, Carlos)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3Lions Publishing, Inc. v. HIPAA Compliance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3Lions Publishing, Inc.
Represented By: Carlos A. Leyva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HIPAA Compliance Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry N Talcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyond Wellness, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?