Kurlander et al v. Kaplan et al

Plaintiff: Edwin M. Stanton, Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Stanton Holdings, LLC and Philip Kurlander
Defendant: Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC, Robert R. Kaplan and Robert R. Kaplan, Jr.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00742
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED HEARING (previously set for 8/1/2019 and at parties' request) on #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint set for 8/7/2019 at 9:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (This case will immediately follow 8:19-cv-644)(CCB)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #33 Motion to Continue hearing set for 8/1/2019. Separate notice of hearing to follow. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/8/2019. (CCB)
July 1, 2019 Filing 33 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Hearing on Motion to Dismiss by Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Stanton Holdings, LLC. (Anthony, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Stanton Holdings, LLC. (Anthony, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Stanton Holdings, LLC. (Anthony, John)
June 13, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of RESCHEDULED HEARING on #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint set for 8/1/2019 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (CCB)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint Responses due by 6/28/2019; Replies due by 7/22/2019; CMR due by 8/8/2019. Notice rescheduling hearing to follow. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/13/2019. (CCB)
June 12, 2019 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint , #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Stanton Holdings, LLC. (Anthony, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 12, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of compliance by Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC re 25 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice (Pearson, Eric) Modified text on 6/13/2019 (KMM).
June 11, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of HEARING on #19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support, #23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint set for 7/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15 B before Judge William F. Jung. (This will immediately follow the hearing scheduled in 8:19-cv-644-T-02CPT)(CCB)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Eric Pearson may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC, with Attorney Michael P. Matthews designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/10/2019. (VIV)
June 10, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Eric Pearson, appearing on behalf of Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056873.) Related document: #24 MOTION for Eric Pearson to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Eric Pearson to appear pro hac vice by Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. (Matthews, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 24, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. (Matthews, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. Related case(s): yes (Matthews, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 21 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. (Matthews, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P Matthews on behalf of Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC (Matthews, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support by Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan. (Ketchey, Charles)
May 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Patrick D. Houston, appearing on behalf of (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056393.) Related document: #17 MOTION for Patrick D. Houston to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stephen M. Faraci, appearing on behalf of (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056393.) Related document: #16 MOTION for Stephen M. Faraci, Sr. to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 2, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Vernon E. Inge, appearing on behalf of (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056393.) Related document: #15 MOTION for Vernon E. Inge, Jr. to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice; granting #17 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Vernon E. Inge, Jr., Stephen M. Faraci, and Patrick D. Houston may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Defendants Robert R. Kaplan and Robert R. Kaplan, Jr., with Attorney Charles F. Ketchey designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 4/29/2019. (VIV)
April 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Patrick D. Houston to appear pro hac vice by Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan. (Ketchey, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 26, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Stephen M. Faraci, Sr. to appear pro hac vice by Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan. (Ketchey, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 26, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Vernon E. Inge, Jr. to appear pro hac vice by Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan. (Ketchey, Charles) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint for all Defendants on or before 5/24/2019. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/25/2019. (CCB)
April 25, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Respond to Complaint by Robert R. Kaplan. (Leonard, Anne)
April 24, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Stanton Holdings, LLC. (Anthony, John)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Baker Hill Holding, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Stanton Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Anthony, John)
April 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan, Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. (Ketchey, Charles)
April 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan, Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. Related case(s): yes (Ketchey, Charles)
April 22, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Crane Lieb on behalf of Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan (Lieb, Stephanie)
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Franklin Ketchey, Jr on behalf of Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan (Ketchey, Charles)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 04/10/2019 by Stanton Holdings, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Baker Hill Holding, LLC as to Robert R. Kaplan. (Anthony, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 04/10/2019 by Stanton Holdings, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Baker Hill Holding, LLC as to Robert R. Kaplan, Jr. (Anthony, John)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 RETURN of service executed on 04/11/2019 by Stanton Holdings, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Baker Hill Holding, LLC as to Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. (Anthony, John)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/9/2019. (SAO)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan, Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC. (KMM)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert R. Kaplan, Jr, Robert R. Kaplan, Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA-56014 filed by Stanton Holdings, LLC, Philip Kurlander, Edwin M. Stanton, Baker Hill Holding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B and C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F part 1, #6 Exhibit F part 2, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kurlander et al v. Kaplan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaplan Voekler Cunningham & Frank PLC
Represented By: Michael P Matthews
Represented By: Eric G. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Kaplan
Represented By: Stephen M. Faraci, Sr.
Represented By: Charles Franklin Ketchey, Jr.
Represented By: Vernon E. Inge
Represented By: Patrick D. Houston
Represented By: Anne Connelly Leonard
Represented By: Stephanie Crane Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Kaplan, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen M. Faraci, Sr.
Represented By: Charles Franklin Ketchey, Jr.
Represented By: Vernon E. Inge
Represented By: Patrick D. Houston
Represented By: Stephanie Crane Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin M. Stanton
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Andrew James Ghekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baker Hill Holding, LLC
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Andrew James Ghekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanton Holdings, LLC
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Andrew James Ghekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Kurlander
Represented By: John A. Anthony
Represented By: Andrew James Ghekas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?