Rahall, et al v. Cory, et al

Plaintiff: MONIER RAHALL and Barry Tucker
Defendant: YEHIA AWADA, Arlene Shipalesky, Glenn Ohno, Julie Lynch, Timothy S. Cory, John Lynch, III, Christina Ortiz, John Fuhr, Leighann Wolkowski, Tiffany Ohno, Vicki Lynch, Stephen Ortiz, Brent Fuhr, Kellie Fuhr, William M. Ernst, Does 1 through 20 are companies formed under the laws of the State of Nevada or other states who have conspired with, assisted or worked with Defendants, Ken Shipalesky, David Austin, Michael Lynch, John Lynch, Jr. and Patrick Lynch
Case Number: 8:2019cv00748
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332fd
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS issued as to Timothy S. Cory. (LD)
June 30, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Monier Rahall. (Saliba, William)
June 21, 2019 Filing 23 AFFIDAVIT of Monier Rahall re: #21 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss by Monier Rahall. (Saliba, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 22 AFFIDAVIT of Monier Rahall re: #21 Response in Opposition to Motion by Monier Rahall. (Saliba, William)
June 20, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to Change Venue filed by Monier Rahall. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In response to show cause order)(Saliba, William)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint. Plaintiffs' Motion fails to articulate any basis for the extension and does not include a memorandum of law or a 3.01(g) certification in violation of the Court's Local Rules. Thus, the Motion is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to Plaintiffs' right to re-file the motion in compliance with the Local Rules. The Court further notes that Plaintiffs have failed to provide any response to the Court's Show Cause Order (Dkt. 16). Plaintiffs shall have up to and including THREE (3) DAYS from the date of this Order to respond to the Court's Show Cause Order. Failure to respond to the Court's Show Cause Order will result in dismissal of this action without further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/17/2019. (DKC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 First MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (Saliba, William)
May 30, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of service by Yehia Awada re #15 Joinder in motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 17 JOINDER in motion by Timothy S. Cory re #13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to Change Venue filed by John Lynch, III, Kellie Fuhr. (LD)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SHOW CAUSE ORDER. Plaintiffs shall have up to and including June 12, 2019 to SHOW CAUSE why Defendants John Lynch and Kellie Fuhr's Motion (1) to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, (2) to Dismiss for Improper Venue; or (3) Alternatively, Motion to Change Venue should not be GRANTED. Failure to do so will result in the Court considering the Motion to be unopposed and may result in the dismissal of the action with no further notice from the Court. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/28/2019. (DKC)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 JOINDER in motion by Yehia Awada re #13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION to Change Venue filed by John Lynch, III, Kellie Fuhr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(LD)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Unopposed Motion for Pro Hac Vice Admission of Jerimy Kirschner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/9/2019. (AHA)
May 9, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jerimy Kirschner (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056493.) Related document: #12 Unopposed MOTION for Jerimy Kirschner to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 8, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION to Change Venue by Kellie Fuhr(as Trustee for the John Lynch and Kellie Fuhr Family Trust), Kellie Fuhr(individually), John Lynch, III(individually), John Lynch, III(as Trustee for the John Lynch and Kellie Furh Family Trust). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Ewusiak, Joel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION for Jerimy Kirschner to appear pro hac vice by Kellie Fuhr(as Trustee for the John Lynch and Kellie Fuhr Family Trust), Kellie Fuhr(individually), John Lynch, III(individually), John Lynch, III(as Trustee for the John Lynch and Kellie Furh Family Trust). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Jerimy Kirschner))(Ewusiak, Joel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 8, 2019 Filing 11 Written designation and consent to act by Joel J. Ewusiak on behalf of Kellie Fuhr(as Trustee for the John Lynch and Kellie Fuhr Family Trust), Kellie Fuhr(individually), John Lynch, III(individually), John Lynch, III(as Trustee for the John Lynch and Kellie Furh Family Trust). Local Counsel: Joel Ewusiak. Non-Resident Counsel: Jerimy Kirschner. (Ewusiak, Joel)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS issued as to Yehia Awada. (LD)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Monier Rahall. (Saliba, William)
April 29, 2019 Filing 8 TERMINATED. PROPOSED summons to be issued by Monier Rahall. (Saliba, William) NOTE: Incomplete, counsel notified. Modified on 4/30/2019 (LD).
April 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Monier Rahall PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (Saliba, William)
April 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of compliance by Monier Rahall (Saliba, William)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/1/2019. (KTT)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/15/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/1/2019. (KTT)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-748-T-35CPT. (SJB)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Monier Rahall re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet (Saliba, William)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15290654) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit)(Saliba, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rahall, et al v. Cory, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONIER RAHALL
Represented By: William S. Saliba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Tucker
Represented By: William S. Saliba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YEHIA AWADA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene Shipalesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn Ohno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy S. Cory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lynch, III
Represented By: Jerimy Kirschner
Represented By: Joel J. Ewusiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christina Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fuhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leighann Wolkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Ohno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicki Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brent Fuhr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kellie Fuhr
Represented By: Jerimy Kirschner
Represented By: Joel J. Ewusiak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William M. Ernst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20 are companies formed under the laws of the State of Nevada or other states who have conspired with, assisted or worked with Defendants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Shipalesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Lynch, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?