Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.238.60

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.238.60
Case Number: 8:2019cv00781
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time within which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant. For good cause shown, the Plaintiff is granted an extension of time to 9/13/2019 to serve the Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 7/1/2019. (AHA)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to extend time to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 5/6/2019. (AHA)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically for Leave to Serve A Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Greg Lansky, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Tobias Fieser, #3 Exhibit C - Declaration of Philip Pasquale, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #5 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit E Proposed Order)(Walker, Rachel)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Case Reassigned pursuant to standing order in case 8:19-mc-41-T-23 to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-781-T-35CPT. Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn no longer assigned to the case. (Standing order attached for reference.) (KE)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2019. (KTT)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 4/17/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/3/2019. (KTT)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 Copyright Report sent to Washington. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (LNR)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-781-T-35SPF. (SJB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Related case(s): no (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Walker, Rachel)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Action for Damages for Property Rights Infringement and Demand for Jury Trial - Injunctive Relief Sought against JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.238.60 with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15304759) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to the Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.238.60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Rachel Elizabeth Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHN DOE subscriber assigned IP address 47.199.238.60
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?