Neal v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP

Plaintiff: Sandra Neal
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 8:2019cv00785
Filed: April 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James S Moody
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/7/2020; Dispositive motions due by 9/9/2020; Pretrial Conference set for THURSDAY, NOVEMBER 12, 2020 at 10:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Jury Trial set for the DECEMBER 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 17 before Judge James S. Moody Jr. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/23/2019. (KAC)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Mejia, Nicia)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #6 Answer to Complaint filed by Sandra Neal. (Culpepper, Philip)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Mejia, Nicia)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sandra Neal. Related case(s): yes (Culpepper, Philip)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice OF PENDENCY OF OTHER ACTIONS (Mejia, Nicia)
April 3, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/3/2019. (SMB)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:19-cv-785-T-30CPT. (SJB)
April 1, 2019 Filing 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15305314 filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit, #3 State Court AMENDED COMPLAINT, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 State Court Other Documents)(Mejia, Nicia) Modified on 4/3/2019 (LSS). (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (LSS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neal v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Nicia Carolina Mejia
Represented By: Cynthia Moore Dennen
Represented By: Schuyler Analise Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Neal
Represented By: Philip Bruce Culpepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?