Roor International BV et al v. Just Chill 'N, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc. and Roor International BV
Defendant: Diana M Bell and Just Chill 'N, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00831
Filed: April 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/10/2019. (GMD)
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 4/25/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Just Chill 'N, Inc.. (Sasson, Jamie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 4/25/19 by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. as to Diana M Bell. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #11 Defendants' Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Response to Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including June 17, 2019 to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/16/2019. (GMD)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Diana M Bell, Just Chill 'N, Inc.. (Willhoit, Rashida)
May 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Edmund J. Gegan on behalf of Diana M Bell, Just Chill 'N, Inc. (Gegan, Edmund)
May 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Rashida L. Willhoit on behalf of Diana M Bell, Just Chill 'N, Inc. (Willhoit, Rashida)
May 1, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Jarir Farraj for Sream, Inc.; Other Affiliate Martin Birzle for Roor International BV.. (Sasson, Jamie)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Roor International BV, Sream, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Sasson, Jamie)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E) (LD)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Diana M Bell, Just Chill 'N, Inc. (LD)
April 8, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-831-T-35AEP. (SJB)
April 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15329069) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Proposed Summons, #8 Proposed Summons)(Sasson, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roor International BV et al v. Just Chill 'N, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roor International BV
Represented By: Jamie Alan Sasson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana M Bell
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Just Chill 'N, Inc.
Represented By: Edmund J. Gegan
Represented By: Rashida L. Willhoit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?