NextHome, Inc. v. Timothy Edmond Hall et al
Plaintiff: NextHome, Inc.
Defendant: Tatyana Hall d/b/a Realty Cards, Timothy Edmond Hall d/b/a Realty Cards, Tatyana Hall, Digital Creative, LLC and Timothy Edmond Hall
Case Number: 8:2019cv00849
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE of hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 7/17/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew. (JD)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #30 motion to stay this case. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/8/2019. (JD)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ENDORSED ORDER granting #31 motion to terminate 29 motion to stay due to the filing of an amended motion #30. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/5/19. (JD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 33 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Lueck, Dwight)
July 3, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 3 and 4 of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Slater, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically permanently remove from docket (Doc. 29) by All Defendants. (Slater, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 30 MOTION to Amend/Correct 29 MOTION to stay and for In-Court Case Management Meeting by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Slater, J.)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to stay and for In-Court Case Management Meeting by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Slater, J.) Modified on 7/3/2019 counsel called, document contains sealed information. counsel to file motion to strike/remove. Redacted motion filed at #30 amended motion (BES). Modified on 7/8/2019 , Images removed per 34 Order.(BSN).
June 18, 2019 Filing 28 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Digital Creative, LLC. (Wasylik, Dineen)
June 18, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Co-Counsel Appearance by Dineen Pashoukos Wasylik on behalf of Digital Creative, LLC, Tatyana Hall, Timothy Edmond Hall (Wasylik, Dineen)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #25 Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint until 7/3/19 and to file the case management report by 7/8/19. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 6/18/2019. (JD)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File response to Amended Complaint and to file completed Case Management Report by All Defendants. (Slater, J.)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 RETURN of service executed on 06/12/2019 by NextHome, Inc. as to Digital Creative, LLC. (Wade, Kathleen)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by J. Scott Slater on behalf of Digital Creative, LLC, Tatyana Hall, Timothy Edmond Hall (Slater, J.)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ENDORSED ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Telephonically at case management conference. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 6/7/2019. (JD)
June 7, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Telephonically - Plaintiff's Motion to Permit Counsel and Pro Se Parties to Meet Telephonically for Preparation of Case Management Report by NextHome, Inc.. (Lueck, Dwight) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
June 7, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS issued as to Digital Creative, LLC. (BSN)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 PROPOSED summons to be issued by NextHome, Inc. (Wade, Kathleen)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT against NextHome, Inc. filed by NextHome, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wade, Kathleen)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #15 motion to amend the complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file the amended complaint by 6/13/19. Granting #16 motion for clarification, clarifying that the Hall defendants must only respond to the amended complaint, and they must do so within 14 days after the filing of the amended complaint. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 6/6/19. (JD)
June 5, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for clarification re 14 Order on motion for extension of time to answer by Tatyana Hall, Timothy Edmond Hall. (BSN)
May 28, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for leave to file Amended Complaint and to Add a Party Defendant by NextHome, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint)(Lueck, Dwight) Modified text on 5/28/2019 (BSN).
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time respond to the complaint. Tatyana Hall and Timothy Edmond Hall's responses must be filed by 6/7/2019. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 5/10/2019. (JD)
May 9, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Tatyana Hall, Timothy Edmond Hall. (BSN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER granting #11 motion to appear pro hac vice. Dwight D. Lueck is directed to sign up for CM/ECF, enter an email address in his CM/ECF account, and electronically file a notice of compliance with this Court's Order by 5/24/19. The Clerk is directed not to send paper copies to him after sending this Order. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 4/25/19. (JD)
April 25, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Dwight D. Lueck, Esq, appearing on behalf of NextHome, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056325.) Related document: #11 MOTION for Dwight D. Lueck, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
April 24, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Dwight D. Lueck, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by NextHome, Inc. (Wade, Kathleen) Modified text on 4/24/2019 (BSN).
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on April 18, 2019 by NextHome, Inc. as to Tatyana Hall. (Wade, Kathleen)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on April 18, 2019 by NextHome, Inc. as to Timothy Edmond Hall. (Wade, Kathleen)
April 10, 2019 Filing 8 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (LSS)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to counsel Dwight D. Lueck of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LSS)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Tatyana Hall, Timothy Edmond Hall. (LSS)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
April 9, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-849-T- 24JSS. (SJB)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by NextHome, Inc.. (Wade, Kathleen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 PROPOSED summons to be issued by NextHome, Inc.. (Wade, Kathleen)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tatyana Hall d/b/a Realty Cards, Timothy Edmond Hall d/b/a Realty Cards (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-15334332) filed by NextHome, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wade, Kathleen) Modified on 4/9/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NextHome, Inc. v. Timothy Edmond Hall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatyana Hall d/b/a Realty Cards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Edmond Hall d/b/a Realty Cards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatyana Hall
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Represented By: Dineen Pashoukos Wasylik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Creative, LLC
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Represented By: Dineen Pashoukos Wasylik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Edmond Hall
Represented By: J. Scott Slater
Represented By: Dineen Pashoukos Wasylik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NextHome, Inc.
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Represented By: Dwight D. Lueck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?