Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. v. Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brew Bus Brewing, Inc.
Defendant: Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC d/b/a Florida Avenue Eats, Gregory Spadaccini and Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv00888
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/26/2019. (APF)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. (Pollack, Woodrow)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/1/2019. (APF)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of settlement by Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. (Pollack, Woodrow)
April 19, 2019 Filing 10 RETURN of service executed on 04/17/2019 by Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. as to Gregory Spadaccini. (Pollack, Woodrow)
April 19, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 04/17/2019 by Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. as to Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC. (Pollack, Woodrow)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/1/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 4/17/2019. (KTT)
April 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. of Civil Cover Sheet. (Pollack, Woodrow)
April 16, 2019 Filing 5 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Copy of Complaint) (LNR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Gregory Spadaccini, Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC. (LNR)
April 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 1.05(e) (signed by deputy clerk). (LNR)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-888-T-35AEP. (SJB)
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15353770) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Proposed Summons as to Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC, #8 Proposed Summons as to Gregory Spadaccini)(Pollack, Woodrow) Modified text on 4/16/2019 (LNR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brew Bus Brewing, Inc. v. Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC d/b/a Florida Avenue Eats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Spadaccini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spaddys Coffee West Tampa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brew Bus Brewing, Inc.
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?