Highland v. Selene Finance

Plaintiff: Patrick Highland
Defendant: Selene Finance
Case Number: 8:2019cv00890
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: On April 15, 2019, Pro se Plaintiff Patrick Highland initiated this action and moved for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and for a temporary restraining order. (Doc. # #1, #2, #3). On April 29, 2019, Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone denied Mr. Highland's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis and instructed Mr. Highland that he must pay the filing fee by May 13, 2019, to continue this action. (Doc. #6). Judge Sansone also explained that "failure to timely pay the filing fee may result in dismissal of this matter without further notice." (Id. at 2). As of this order, Mr. Highland has not paid the filing fee. Accordingly, this action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/14/2019. (DLB)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 4/29/2019. (BEE)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff shall review and comply with the provisions of this Order, as well as the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules of the Middle District of Florida, and any applicable statutes and regulations. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/24/2019. (TWL)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 4/24/2019. (TWL)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for temporary restraining order by Patrick Highland. (BES)
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Patrick Highland. (BES) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Modified on 4/16/2019 corrected filing party (BES).
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Cancel Foreclosure Sale against Selene Finance filed by Patrick Highland.(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Highland v. Selene Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Highland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?