Ayers v. Area Agency on Aging of Pasco-Pinellas Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharon Thompson Ayers
Defendant: Area Agency on Aging of Pasco-Pinellas Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv00905
Filed: April 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 4/18/2019. (SRC)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ENDORSED ORDER denying #2 motion to submit an audio of the agency's selection committee recordings. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 4/17/2019. (RLH)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/2008. (JCG)
April 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically submit an audio of the agencys selection committee recordings by Sharon Thompson Ayers. (JCG)
April 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Area Agency on Aging of Pasco-Pinellas Inc. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA056148 filed by Sharon Thompson Ayers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(JCG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayers v. Area Agency on Aging of Pasco-Pinellas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Thompson Ayers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Area Agency on Aging of Pasco-Pinellas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?