United States of America v. 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: 6922 LaCantera Circle, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 4058 Founders Club Drive, LLC, Sarasota, Florida, 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, Longboat Key, Florida, 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 4064 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, Florida, 16804 Vardon Terrace, #108, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 17006 Vardon Terrace, #105, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 16904 Vardon Terrace, #106, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, Ken Burton, Jr., Manatee County Tax Collector and Barbara Ford Coates
Not Yet Classified: Burton W. Wiand
Claimant: Natalee A Herrig, Heather Perry and Steve F Herrig
Interested Party: Michael J. Dacorta
Case Number: 8:2019cv00908
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by United States of America re #54 Claim (Nebesky, Suzanne)
July 2, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE of hearing on motion re #53 MOTION for judgment of forfeiture set for 7/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung. (SAO)
June 26, 2019 Filing 54 CLAIM Verified by Sailboat Square Condominium Association, Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Darken, Kevin)
June 26, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION for judgment of forfeiture by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Declaration in Support)(Nebesky, Suzanne)
June 25, 2019 Filing 52 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Heather Perry.(Essenson, James) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (KMM).
June 21, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE to the Court regarding The Sarasota County Tax Collector by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (KMM).
June 21, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE to the Court regarding The Manatee County Tax Collector by United States of America re #40 Claim (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (KMM).
June 21, 2019 Filing 49 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Natalee A Herrig, Steve F Herrig.(Johnson, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Filing 48 AMENDED Notice of filing consent forfeiture agreement by United States of America. Amendment to #45 Notice (Other) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A_Consent Forfeiture Agreement with Ex A,B,C)(Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (KMM).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ENDORSED ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jacob Vickers Stuart, Jr terminated. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/19/2019. (CCB)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ENDORSED ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher Kaigle terminated. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/19/2019. (CCB)
June 19, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE of filing consent forfeiture agreement by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit _Consent Forfeiture Agreement)(Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 6/19/2019 (KMM).
June 17, 2019 Filing 44 Amended MOTION for Jacob Stuart to withdraw as attorney by Michael J. Dacorta. (Stuart, Jacob)
June 17, 2019 Filing 43 Amended MOTION for Christopher Kaigle to withdraw as attorney by Michael J. Dacorta. (Stuart, Jacob)
June 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by Barbara Ford Coates Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Amended Complaint for Forfeiture (Kayan, Bora)
June 14, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Bora Sabih Kayan on behalf of Barbara Ford Coates (Kayan, Bora)
June 13, 2019 Filing 40 *** Counsel notified to re-file with the proper cover sheet listing the style of the case and the case number *** CLAIM lien for ad valorem taxes and assessments by Ken Burton, Jr., Manatee County Tax Collector. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bryant, Patrick) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 6/14/2019 (KMM).
June 13, 2019 Filing 39 Acknowledgement of Receipt of Notice of Amended Complaint for Forfeiture ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by Ken Burton, Jr., Manatee County Tax Collector.(Bryant, Patrick)
June 13, 2019 Filing 38 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #12 Amended Complaint by Ken Burton, Jr., Manatee County Tax Collector.(Bryant, Patrick)
June 12, 2019 Filing 37 CLAIM Interest in real property by Heather Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Mortgage showing interest in property)(Essenson, James)
June 12, 2019 Filing 36 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice Interested Persons by Heather Perry. (Essenson, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 35 CLAIM Verified by Natalee A Herrig, Steve F Herrig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Johnson, Charles)
June 11, 2019 Filing 34 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice by Steve F Herrig, Natalee A Herrig. (Johnson, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 *** Counsel notified to re-file with the correct signature *** Unopposed MOTION for Christopher Kaigle to withdraw as attorney by Michael J. Dacorta. (Stuart, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified text and NEF regenerated on 6/10/2019 (KMM).
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 *** Counsel notified to re-file with the correct signature *** Unopposed MOTION for Jacob Stuart to withdraw as attorney by Michael J. Dacorta. (Stuart, Jacob) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified text and NEF regenerated on 6/10/2019 (KMM).
May 22, 2019 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #29 Notice of appearance, #30 Notice of pendency of related cases, #12 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint by Michael J. Dacorta. (Stuart, Jacob)
May 22, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael J. Dacorta. Related case(s): yes (Stuart, Jacob)
May 22, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Vickers Stuart, Jr on behalf of Michael J. Dacorta (Stuart, Jacob) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 5/23/2019 (KMM). *** Counsel notified that each attorney filing an appearance needs file their own Notice of Appearance ***
May 20, 2019 Filing 28 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: Official Government Internet Site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication 30 consecutive days from April 20, 2019 through May 19, 2019. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
May 16, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick G. Bryant on behalf of Ken Burton, Jr., Manatee County Tax Collector (Bryant, Patrick)
May 2, 2019 Filing 26 US Marshal 285 form for Post and Walk on 5/2/19 on 4064 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 25 US Marshal 285 form for post and walk on 5/2/19 on 17006 Vardon Terrace, #105, Lakewood Ranch, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 US Marshal 285 form for Post and Walk on 5/2/19 on 444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, Longboat Key, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 23 US Marshal 285 form for Post and Walk on 5/2/19 for 16804 Vardon Terrace, #108, Lakewood Ranch, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 US Marshal 285 form for 4058 Founders Club Drive, LLC, Sarasota, Florida for post and walk on 5/2/19. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 21 US Marshal 285 form for post and walk on 5/2/19 on 16904 Vardon Terrace, #106, Lakewood Ranch, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 US Marshal 285 form for Post and Walk on 5/2/19 on 6922 LaCantera Circle, Lakewood Ranch, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 19 US Marshal 285 form for post and walk on 5/2/19 on 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida. (KMM)
May 2, 2019 Filing 18 US Marshal 285 form for post and walk on 5/2/19 on 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ranch, Florida. (KMM)
April 24, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jared J. Perez on behalf of 4064 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, Florida, 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 16804 Vardon Terrace, #108, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 16904 Vardon Terrace, #106, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 17006 Vardon Terrace, #105, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 4058 Founders Club Drive, LLC, Sarasota, Florida, 444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, Longboat Key, Florida, 6922 LaCantera Circle, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, Burton W. Wiand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Order Appointing Receiver)(Perez, Jared)
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice by United States of America. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
April 24, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #14 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Nebesky, Suzanne)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 4/22/2019. (SAO)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ranch, Florida 34202 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by United States of America.(Nebesky, Suzanne)
April 17, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 16904 Vardon Terrace, #106, Bradenton, Florida 34211 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 16804 Vardon Terrace, #108, Bradenton, Florida 34211 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 17006 Vardon Terrace, #105, Bradenton, Florida 34211 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, #3, Longboat Key, Florida 34228,by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ridge, Florida 34202 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 4/18/2019 (KMM). *** Counsel notified that the text indicates Lakewood Ridge rather than Lakewood Ranch ***
April 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 4058 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, Florida 34240 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 4064 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, FL 34202 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 6922 LaCantera Circle, Lakewood Ranch, Florida 34202 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of lis pendens as to 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida 34202 by United States of America (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 *** Counsel notified to re-file using the correct event Amended Complaint *** AMENDED document by United States of America. Amendment to #1 Complaint . (Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified text and NEF regenerated on 4/18/2019 (KMM).
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against 4064 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, Florida, 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 16804 Vardon Terrace, #108, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 16904 Vardon Terrace, #106, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 17006 Vardon Terrace, #105, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, Longboat Key, Florida, 6922 LaCantera Circle, Lakewood Ranch, Florida, 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ranch, Florida filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KMM) Modified text per counsel on 4/17/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 6922 LaCantera Circle, Lakewood Ranch, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4058 Founders Club Drive, LLC, Sarasota, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 13318 Lost Key Place, Lakewood Ranch, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 444 Gulf of Mexico Drive, Longboat Key, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 7312 Desert Ridge Glen, Lakewood Ranch, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4064 Founders Club Drive, Sarasota, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16804 Vardon Terrace, #108, Lakewood Ranch, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 17006 Vardon Terrace, #105, Lakewood Ranch, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 16904 Vardon Terrace, #106, Lakewood Ranch, Florida
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Burton, Jr., Manatee County Tax Collector
Represented By: Patrick G. Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ford Coates
Represented By: Bora Sabih Kayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Burton W. Wiand
Represented By: Jared J. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Suzanne C. Nebesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Natalee A Herrig
Represented By: Charles F. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Heather Perry
Represented By: James L. Essenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Steve F Herrig
Represented By: Charles F. Johnson, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael J. Dacorta
Represented By: Jacob Vickers Stuart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?