Pritchard v. APYX Medical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kyle Pritchard
Defendant: Charles D. Goodwin and APYX Medical Corporation
Petitioner: Gregory P Mouton and Michael T Dolan
Case Number: 8:2019cv00919
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot #7 Movant Michael T. Dolan's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel in light of #9 Movant's Notice of Withdrawal of that Motion. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/8/2019. (DMB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of service by Gregory P Mouton re #8 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Desmond, Leo)
July 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of withdrawal of motion by Michael T Dolan re #7 MOTION for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel filed by Michael T Dolan (O'Brien, Cullin)
July 1, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel filed by Gregory P Mouton. (Desmond, Leo)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for appointment as Lead Plaintiff and approval of his selection of counsel and incorporated memorandum of law in support by Michael T Dolan. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration, #2 Exhibit Certification, #3 Exhibit Loss Chart, #4 Exhibit PSLRA Notice, #5 Exhibit Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit Firm Resume, #7 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(O'Brien, Cullin) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. Modified text on 6/19/2019 (AG).
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM in support re #5 Motion to Appoint CounselMotion for Miscellaneous Relief filed by Gregory P Mouton. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Leo W. Desmond, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Leo W. Desmond, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Leo W. Desmond, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Leo W. Desmond, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Leo W. Desmond, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration of Leo W. Desmond)(Desmond, Leo) Modified text on 6/18/2019 (JCG).
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Counsel , MOTION for miscellaneous relief, specifically Appointment of Lead Plaintiff and Approval Of Lead Counsel by Gregory P Mouton. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Desmond, Leo) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. **CHANGED TO NOTICE. FILED INCORRECTLY AS MOTION on 6/19/2019 (LSS). Modified per chambers as Motion on 6/26/2019 (BSN).
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to APYX Medical Corporation, Charles D. Goodwin. (BSN)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-919-T-24AEP. (SJB)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15366950) filed by Kyle Pritchard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of Kyle Pritchard, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Desmond, Leo) Modified text on 4/18/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pritchard v. APYX Medical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles D. Goodwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APYX Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle Pritchard
Represented By: Leo Wassner Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory P Mouton
Represented By: Leo Wassner Desmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael T Dolan
Represented By: Cullin Avram O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?