Osborne v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Osborne
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 8:2019cv00990
Filed: April 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may hold their case management report meeting telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/2/2019. (VIV)
July 1, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Michael Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Price, Robert) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of compliance re 17 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Walker, Joshua)
June 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Richard McLure Dye, appearing on behalf of Ethicon, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056821.) Related document: #16 MOTION for Richard M. Dye, Esq. to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Richard M. Dye may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Defendants, with Attorney Joshua B. Walker designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/31/2019. (VIV)
May 31, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Richard M. Dye, Esq. to appear pro hac vice by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Joshua) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 29, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. Related case(s): no (Walker, Joshua)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Walker, Joshua)
May 28, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Johnson & Johnson.(Walker, Joshua)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Ethicon, Inc.(Walker, Joshua) Modified on 5/29/2019 (DG).
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Michael Osborne. (Price, Robert)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Osborne. Related case(s): yes (Price, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 05/07/2019 by Michael Osborne as to Johnson & Johnson. (Price, Robert)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 05/07/2019 by Michael Osborne as to Ethicon, Inc. (Price, Robert) Modified on 5/14/2019 (DG).
May 9, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Michael Osborne. (Price, Robert)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Michael Osborne. Related case(s): Yes (Price, Robert)
April 26, 2019 FEES paid by Michael Osborne (Filing fee $400 receipt number TPA056329). (JCG)
April 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (DG)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-990-T-36AEP. (SJB)
April 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson with Jury Demand filed by Michael Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Price, Robert) Modified on 4/25/2019 to correct docket text (SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua B. Walker
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Joshua B. Walker
Represented By: Richard McLure Dye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Osborne
Represented By: Robert Elliott Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?