Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. v. Jenkins et al
Plaintiff: Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.
Defendant: Sims HD, LLC, Sims Crane & Equipment Co. and Casey Jenkins
Case Number: 8:2019cv01004
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/8/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2019, Pretrial statement due by 3/24/2020, All other motions due by 3/31/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/21/2020 at 3:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Bench Trial set for term commencing 5/4/2020 in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 10/11/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/3/2019. (BGS)
July 1, 2019 Filing 35 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Preston, Brett)
June 28, 2019 Filing 34 RESPONSE to objections to #29 Report and Recommendations -- In Opposition filed by Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC. (Mullen, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC. (Mullen, John)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC.(Mullen, John)
June 14, 2019 Filing 31 DECLARATION of Clark C. Johnson re #30 Objection by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Luikart, David)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 OBJECTION re #29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #7 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. . (Luikart, David)
June 5, 2019 Filing 29 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/5/2019. (CKR)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The Court will take no further action on the Orders to Show Cause and they are discharged. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/31/2019. (BGS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 26 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #24 Order to show cause filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Luikart, David)
May 17, 2019 Filing 25 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn: MOTION HEARING held on 5/17/2019 re #7 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. Court Reporter: Sharon A. Miller (EJC)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies noted herein. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/16/2019. (BGS)
May 15, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of supplemental authority re #7 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Luikart, David) Modified on 5/16/2019 (JCG).
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Mullen, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of compliance re 16 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. (Johnson, Clark)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/9/2019. (Flynn, Sean)
May 9, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Preston, Brett)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Preston, Brett)
May 9, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC. (Mullen, John)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Clark C. Johnson may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Brett J. Preston designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Please note that a local attorney must also be present for any evidentiary hearing before the district judge and during trial. Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the electronic filing requirement and file a notice of compliance with said requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/9/2019. (NCR)
May 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by John D. Mullen on behalf of Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC (Mullen, John)
May 8, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #10 Order to show cause filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Preston, Brett)
May 8, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Clark C. Johnson, appearing on behalf of (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056474.) Related document: #13 Unopposed MOTION for Clark C. Johnson to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Clark C. Johnson to appear pro hac vice by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Preston, Brett) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Luikart, III on behalf of Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. (Luikart, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. (Preston, Brett)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff is directed to SHOW CAUSE as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Plaintiff shall file a written response with the Court within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS from the date of this Order. Additionally, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS which cures the jurisdictional deficiencies noted herein. Failure to respond within the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/1/2019. (BGS)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Hearing on #7 Plaintiff's MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2019 at 01:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11 B before Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 5/1/2019. (CKR)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Referring Motion for Report and Recommendation: #7 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 5/1/2019. (BGS) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Preston, Brett)
April 26, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC. (CTR) (CTR).
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 5/9/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/25/2019. (BGS)
April 25, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1004-T-36SPF. (SJB)
April 25, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Preston, Brett)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Verified) against Casey Jenkins, Sims Crane & Equipment Co., Sims HD, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15396986) filed by Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons for Casey Jenkins, #4 Proposed Summons for Sims Crane & Equipment Co., #5 Proposed Summons Sims HD, LLC)(Preston, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc. v. Jenkins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwards Moving & Rigging, Inc.
Represented By: Brett J. Preston
Represented By: David L. Luikart, III
Represented By: Clark C. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sims HD, LLC
Represented By: John D. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sims Crane & Equipment Co.
Represented By: John D. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Jenkins
Represented By: John D. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?