PNC Bank, National Association v. Norman et al
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Defendant: Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A and Norman Properties, L.L.C.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01009
Filed: April 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Sean P Flynn
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Norman Properties, L.L.C., Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A re #16 Case management and scheduling order INITIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 26(a) (Buford, Charles)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 10/1/2019, Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2019, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/17/2019 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 9/15/2019. This case is set for a nonjury trial on the Court' April 2020 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 6/19/2019. (DMB)
June 17, 2019 Filing 15 Amended ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Norman Properties, L.L.C., Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A.(Buford, Charles)
June 14, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Landkammer, John)
May 20, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Norman Properties, L.L.C., Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A.(Buford, Charles)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles A. Buford on behalf of Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Norman Properties, L.L.C., Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A (Buford, Charles)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT (Possession Certificate) by PNC Bank, National Association. (Landkammer, John)
May 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of lis pendens by PNC Bank, National Association (Landkammer, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 RETURN of service executed on 04/30/2019 by PNC Bank, National Association as to Norman Properties, L.L.C. (Landkammer, John) Modified text on 5/3/2019 (BSN).
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 RETURN of service executed on 04/30/2019 by PNC Bank, National Association as to Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A. (Landkammer, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 04/30/2019 by PNC Bank, National Association as to Carol Robinson Norman. (Landkammer, John)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 04/30/2019 by PNC Bank, National Association as to Robert A. Norman. (Landkammer, John)
April 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
April 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Norman Properties, L.L.C., Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A. (BSN)
April 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by PNC Bank, National Association re #1 Complaint (Landkammer, John)
April 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1009-T-24SPF. (SJB)
April 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert A. Norman, Carol Robinson Norman, Norman Properties, L.L.C., Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15397927) filed by PNC Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #5 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons)(Landkammer, John) Modified party text on 4/26/2019 (BSN).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PNC Bank, National Association v. Norman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Norman
Represented By: Charles A. Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Robinson Norman
Represented By: Charles A. Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert A. Norman, D.O. P.A
Represented By: Charles A. Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Properties, L.L.C.
Represented By: Charles A. Buford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PNC Bank, National Association
Represented By: John W. Landkammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?