AlphaMicron, Inc. v. Transitions Optical, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: AlphaMicron, Inc.
Defendant: Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc., EssilorLuxottica SA and Essilor of America, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01068
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Steven D Merryday
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint, Count 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint Against EssilorLuxottica, and Defendant Essilor Luxoticca, and Memorandum of Law Incorporated Herein filed by AlphaMicron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of C. Cho in support of Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #6 Affidavit Declaration of B. Taheri)(Cho, Christin)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial conference scheduled for 1/19/2021 at 2:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed; jury trial scheduled for the February 2021 trial calendar in Tampa Courtroom 15A before Judge Steven D. Merryday. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/21/2019. (GSO)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #35--motion for an extension of time; extending through 7/3/2019 the time within which AlphaMicron must respond to the motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 6/20/2019. (BK)
June 19, 2019 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #32 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint, Count 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint Against EssilorLuxottica, and Defendant Essilor Luxoticca, and Memorandum of Law Incorporated Herein by AlphaMicron, Inc.. (Simmons, Tori)
June 12, 2019 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Jose D. Alves re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint, Count 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint Against EssilorLuxottica, and Defendant Essilor Luxoticca, and Memorandum of Law Incorporated Herein by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. (Davis, Amber)
June 12, 2019 Filing 33 DECLARATION of Christopher Ricciuti ISO Defendants' Motion to Dismiss re #32 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint, Count 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint Against EssilorLuxottica, and Defendant Essilor Luxoticca, and Memorandum of Law Incorporated Herein by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. (Davis, Amber)
June 12, 2019 Filing 32 MOTION to Dismiss Count 2 of Plaintiff's Complaint, Count 1 of Plaintiff's Complaint Against EssilorLuxottica, and Defendant Essilor Luxoticca, and Memorandum of Law Incorporated Herein by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. (Davis, Amber)
June 10, 2019 Filing 31 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Luikart, David)
June 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Phillippe J.C. Signore (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056773.) Related document: #26 Verified MOTION for Philippe J.C. Signore to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #25--motion for an extension of time; extending through 6/12/2019 the time within which Transitions Optical, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., and Luxottica of America, Inc. must respond to the complaint. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/30/2019. (BK) Modified on 6/3/2019 (BK)to correct date.
May 30, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Christopher Ricciuti (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056716.) Related document: #17 Verified MOTION for Christopher Ricciuti to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jeffrey B. McLntyre (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056716.) Related document: #19 Verified MOTION for Jeffrey B. McIntyre to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Tia D. Fenton (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056716.) Related document: #18 Verified MOTION for Tia D. Fenton to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 29, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. (Davis, Amber)
May 28, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Davis, Amber)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/24/2019. (JAR)
May 24, 2019 Filing 26 Verified MOTION for Philippe J.C. Signore to appear pro hac vice by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
May 24, 2019 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc.. (Davis, Amber)
May 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Greg Dovel, appearing on behalf of AlphaMicron, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056696.) Related document: #23 Unopposed MOTION for Greg Dovel to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 24, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Christin Cho, appearing on behalf of AlphaMicron, Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056696.) Related document: #22 Unopposed MOTION for Christin Cho to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 #23 the Unopposed Motions for Appearance Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/23/2019. (JAR)
May 23, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Greg Dovel to appear pro hac vice by AlphaMicron, Inc.. (Luikart, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
May 23, 2019 Filing 22 Unopposed MOTION for Christin Cho to appear pro hac vice by AlphaMicron, Inc.. (Luikart, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
May 23, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Order per Local Rule 1.04(d) by AlphaMicron, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Luikart, David)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #17 #18 #19 the Verified Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 5/22/2019. (JAR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 19 Verified MOTION for Jeffrey B. McIntyre to appear pro hac vice by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 5/23/2019 (DG).
May 22, 2019 Filing 18 Verified MOTION for Tia D. Fenton to appear pro hac vice by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 5/23/2019 (DG).
May 22, 2019 Filing 17 Verified MOTION for Christopher Ricciuti to appear pro hac vice by Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc. (Davis, Amber) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Modified on 5/23/2019 (DG).
May 21, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Amber N. Davis on behalf of Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc. (Davis, Amber)
May 15, 2019 Filing 15 RETURN of service executed on 05/06/2019 by AlphaMicron, Inc. as to Transitions Optical, Inc. (Luikart, David) Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 05/06/2019 by AlphaMicron, Inc. as to Luxottica of America, Inc. (Luikart, David) Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 05/06/2019 by AlphaMicron, Inc. as to Essilor of America, Inc. (Luikart, David) Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 RETURN of service executed on 05/06/2019 by AlphaMicron, Inc. as to Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc. (Luikart, David) Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by AlphaMicron, Inc. (Luikart, David) Counsel's office notified by telephone on 5/15/19 that item needs to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated. Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG). Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 PROOF of service by AlphaMicron, Inc. (Luikart, David) Counsel's office notified by telephone on 5/15/19 that item needs to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated. Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG). Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of service by AlphaMicron, Inc. (Luikart, David) Counsel's office notified by telephone on 5/15/19 that item needs to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated. Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG). Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 PROOF of service by AlphaMicron, Inc. (Luikart, David) Counsel's office notified by telephone on 5/15/19 that item needs to be refiled using correct docketing code. Item terminated. Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG). Modified on 5/15/2019 (DG).
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re #6--notice of designation of track. See document for details. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 5/9/2019. (GSO)
May 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2. (GSO)
May 3, 2019 Filing 5 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (DG)
May 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., Essilor of America, Inc., EssilorLuxottica SA, Luxottica of America, Inc., Transitions Optical, Inc. (DG)
May 2, 2019 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1068-T-23JSS. (SJB)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by AlphaMicron, Inc.. (Luikart, David)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15422084) filed by AlphaMicron, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Transitions Optical, Inc., #4 Proposed Summons EssilorLuxottica SA, #5 Proposed Summons Essilor of America, Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc., #7 Proposed Summons Luxottica of America, Inc.)(Luikart, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AlphaMicron, Inc. v. Transitions Optical, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essilor Laboratories of America, Inc.
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Christopher Ricciuti
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luxottica of America, Inc.
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Christopher Ricciuti
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transitions Optical, Inc.
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Christopher Ricciuti
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EssilorLuxottica SA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Essilor of America, Inc.
Represented By: Tia D. Fenton
Represented By: Christopher Ricciuti
Represented By: Jeffrey B. McIntyre
Represented By: Philippe J.C. Signore
Represented By: Amber N. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AlphaMicron, Inc.
Represented By: David L. Luikart, III
Represented By: Christin Cho
Represented By: Greg Dovel
Represented By: Tori Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?