Five Percent Nutrition, LLC v. Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC

Plaintiff: Five Percent Nutrition, LLC
Defendant: Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv01162
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER: Defendant Get Fit Fast Supplements has filed a reply in support of its motion to dismiss. (Doc. #16). However, Defendant did not first obtain leave of Court to file such reply as required by Local Rule 3.01(c). Accordingly, the Clerk is directed to strike the unauthorized reply. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/1/2019. (DMD)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 STRICKEN per #16 Order -- REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC. (Cahen, Geoffrey) Modified on 7/2/2019 (BES).
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER: In light of the Court's Case Management and Scheduling Order (Doc. #14), no case management hearing will be held. Additionally, in order to keep cases moving on track, the Court has found it necessary to impose some restrictions on the types and number of extensions to case management deadlines that it grants. Thus, the parties are advised that, while short extensions, especially if unopposed, will be favorably considered, the Court will not substantially move the dispositive motions deadline or the trial date. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/25/2019. (TWL)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/11/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Jury Trial set for the July 2020 trial term in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington, Conduct mediation hearing by 1/14/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/25/2019. (TWL)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss complaint filed by Five Percent Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit)(Maxey-Fisher, Brittany)
June 21, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Brees, William)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #1 Complaint by Five Percent Nutrition, LLC. (Brees, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases Yes per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Five Percent Nutrition, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Brees, William)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss complaint by Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC. (Cahen, Geoffrey)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC. Related case(s): yes (Cahen, Geoffrey)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by June 24, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/29/2019. (DMD)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 PROOF of service by Five Percent Nutrition, LLC (Brees, William)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC. (BES)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA 56534 filed by Five Percent Nutrition, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Five Percent Nutrition, LLC v. Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get Fit Fast Supplements, LLC
Represented By: Geoffrey M. Cahen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Five Percent Nutrition, LLC
Represented By: Jason M. Ellison
Represented By: William R. Brees
Represented By: Brittany J. Maxey
Represented By: Samuel Cooley
Represented By: Brittany J. Maxey-Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?