HornBlasters, LLC v. Gmirr et al

Plaintiff: HornBlasters, LLC
Defendant: Klaus Gmirr and Raul Salas
Case Number: 8:2019cv01164
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS report on Service of Process by HornBlasters, LLC. (Gandre, Kristina)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on its efforts to perfect service of process on Defendants by June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/17/2019. (DMD)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #8 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by HornBlasters, LLC. Related case(s): no (Luikart, David)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/21/2019. (TWL)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/21/2019. (TWL)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Copy of complaint with exhibits) (AG)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff HornBlasters, LLC's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Doc. #2) is referred to the Honorable Thomas G. Wilson, United States Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B), for an evidentiary hearing and the issuance of a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/14/2019. (DMD) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by HornBlasters, LLC. (Luikart, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1164-T-33TGW. (SJB)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by HornBlasters, LLC. (Luikart, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for preliminary injunction and Supporting Memorandum of Law by HornBlasters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Luikart, David)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15464189) filed by HornBlasters, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Luikart, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HornBlasters, LLC v. Gmirr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Klaus Gmirr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raul Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HornBlasters, LLC
Represented By: Kristina Gandre
Represented By: David L. Luikart, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?