Ellis v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tammy Ellis
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01213
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Pretrial statement due by 8/24/2020. Jury Trial set for the OCTOBER 2020 TRIAL TERM, which commences on October 5, 2020, with a more precise trial date to follow. Conduct mediation hearing by 12/2/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/12/2019. (KTT)
June 7, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Bonan, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Tammy Ellis. (Bonan, Thomas)
June 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Tammy Ellis. Related case(s): no (Bonan, Thomas)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The parties may conduct their case management conference telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/3/2019. (NCR)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically at 26(f) Conference by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Whyte, Erika) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantage Score Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Whyte, Erika)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Whyte, Erika)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Whyte, Erika)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2019. (KTT)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2019. (KTT)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1213-T-35SPF. (SJB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Thirteenth Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, FL, case number 19-CA-3746 filed in State Court on April 10, 2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15478384 filed by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Pending Motions, #3 State Court Docket Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Whyte, Erika)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellis v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Ellis
Represented By: Thomas Martin Bonan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Erika Stephanie Whyte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?