Speights v. Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Brandy Speights
Defendant: Plaza Services of Atlanta, LLC and Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01219
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: William F Jung
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020, Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Jury Trial set for the October 2020 trial term commencing 10/05/2020 at 9:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 15B before Judge William F. Jung, Conduct mediation hearing by 11/29/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 6/25/2019. (SAO)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Geiger, Bryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Plaza Services of Atlanta, LLC. (Walker, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC. (Walker, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC, Plaza Services of Atlanta, LLC.(Walker, Christopher)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice by Brandy Speights. (Geiger, Bryan)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Brandy Speights. Related case(s): no (Geiger, Bryan)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/21/2019. (SAO)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge William F. Jung and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1219-T-02SPF. (SJB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15479605 filed by Plaza Services of Atlanta, LLC, Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Walker, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Speights v. Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Plaza Services of Atlanta, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diversified Recovery Bureau, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandy Speights
Represented By: Bryan James Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?