Organic Pet, LLC v. Reilly's Hemp, Inc.

Plaintiff: Organic Pet, LLC d/b/a Riley's Organics and Organic Pet, LLC
Defendant: Reilly's Hemp, Inc. d/b/a/ Reilly's Hempvet and Reilly's Hemp, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01222
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Mary S Scriven
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Organic Pet, LLC. Related case(s): no (Fee, Richard)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Organic Pet, LLC. (Fee, Richard)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 RETURN of service executed on 5/23/2019 by Organic Pet, LLC as to Reilly's Hemp, Inc. (Fee, Richard) Modified text on 6/26/2019 (JCG).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2019. (KTT)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2019. (KTT)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit) (LD)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Reilly's Hemp, Inc. (LD)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1222-T-35TGW. (SJB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Reilly's Hemp, Inc. d/b/a/ Reilly's Hempvet with Jury Demand (Filing Fee $400, Receipt # 113A-15479739) filed by Organic Pet, LLC d/b/a Riley's Organics. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Fee, Richard) Modified on 5/20/2019 to correct docket text(SJB).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Organic Pet, LLC v. Reilly's Hemp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Pet, LLC d/b/a Riley's Organics
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Organic Pet, LLC
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Represented By: Cristina A. Castellvi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly's Hemp, Inc. d/b/a/ Reilly's Hempvet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reilly's Hemp, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?