Anderson v. Mosaic Fertilizer LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Anderson
Defendant: Mosaic Fertilizer LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01225
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by Mosaic Fertilizer LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Weinstein, David)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING IN PART #16 the Parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand and to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Defendant shall have up to and including July 15, 2019 to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss will set by separate Order. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/27/2019. (GMD)
June 26, 2019 Filing 16 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to remand to State Court and Motion to Dismiss by Mosaic Fertilizer LLC. (Weinstein, David)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #13 Plaintiff's Partially Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff shall have up to and including July 15, 2019 to file a response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/14/2019. (GMD)
June 13, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Motion to Remand, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Motion to Remand, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Motion to Remand, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Motion to Remand, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Motion to Remand, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Motion to Remand, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Motion to Remand, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Motion to Remand)(Dreyfus, Andra)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants Motion to Dismiss by Charles Anderson. (Dreyfus, Andra)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Mosaic Fertilizer LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Weinstein, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Mosaic Fertilizer LLC identifying Corporate Parent Mosaic Fertilizer LLC, Other Affiliate David B. Weinstein, Other Affiliate Christopher Torres, Other Affiliate Mosaic Global Operations, Inc., Other Affiliate Phosphate Acquisition Partners, LP, Other Affiliate Mosaic Global Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Greenberg Traurig, P.A., Other Affiliate The Mosaic Company, Other Affiliate FMRP Inc., Other Affiliate PRP-GP LLC, Other Affiliate Ryan Thomas Hopper, Other Affiliate Vitaliy Kats for Mosaic Fertilizer LLC.. (Weinstein, David)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Charles Anderson. (Dreyfus, Andra)
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Charles Anderson. Related case(s): Yes (Dreyfus, Andra)
May 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to dismiss for failure to state a claim by Mosaic Fertilizer LLC. (Weinstein, David)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Vitaliy Kats on behalf of Mosaic Fertilizer LLC (Kats, Vitaliy)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Motion to extend time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before May 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 5/23/2019. (JMF)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to extend time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Mosaic Fertilizer LLC. (Weinstein, David) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2019. (KTT)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 5/20/2019. (KTT)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1225-T-35AEP. (SJB)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 13th Judicial Circuit in and for Hillsborough County, Florida, case number No. 19-CA-003868 filed in State Court on 4/12/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15479943 filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Removal Ex. A, #2 Exhibit Notice of Removal Ex. B, #3 State Court COMPLAINT , #4 Exhibit Ex. A to Complaint, #5 State Court Docket Sheet, #6 State Court Other Documents, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hopper, Ryan) Modified on 5/21/2019 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. Mosaic Fertilizer LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Anderson
Represented By: Andra Todd Dreyfus
Represented By: F. Wallace Pope, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mosaic Fertilizer LLC
Represented By: Ryan Thomas Hopper
Represented By: Christopher Torres
Represented By: David Barnett Weinstein
Represented By: Vitaliy Kats
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?