Krpic v. Progressive Express Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Branko Krpic
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01246
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Susan C Bucklew
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:0635
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 First MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Branko Krpic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Barnes, Stephen) Modified text on 7/18/2019 (BSN).
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/15/2020, Dispositive motions due by 6/15/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 10/7/2020 at 08:30 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10 B before Judge Susan C. Bucklew, Conduct mediation hearing by 5/29/2020. This case is set for a jury trial on the Court's November 2020 trial calendar. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/16/2019. (JD)
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 ADDENDUM to CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Ray, Amy) Modified text on 7/12/2019 (BSN).
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Ray, Amy)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to file a reply brief by July 17, 2019, and Defendant is directed to file a sur-reply by July 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/10/2019. (JD)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER that Plaintiff is directed to show cause by a written response filed on or before 7/15/19 why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to Local Rule 3.10 for lack of prosecution due to the non-filing of a Case Management Report within the time prescribed by this Court's Track Designation Order. Failure to respond shall result in this action being dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Susan C. Bucklew on 7/8/2019. (JD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in opposition re #10 Motion to Remand to State Court filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Ray, Amy)
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for leave to file Motion to Amend Amended Complaint by Branko Krpic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Barnes, Stephen)
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 First MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Branko Krpic. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pending Motion for Remand)(Barnes, Stephen) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (JCG).
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 (TERMINATED; FILER DOESN'T MATCH ATTORNEY SIGNATURE) MOTION to remand to State Court by Branko Krpic. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Accident Report)(Leatherwood, Valerie) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (JCG).
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 (TERMINATED; FILER DOESN'T MATCH ATTORNEY SIGNATURE) MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Notice of Removal /Exhibit 1 - Complaint by Branko Krpic. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Leatherwood, Valerie) Modified text on 6/20/2019 (JCG).
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Ray, Amy)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Progressive Express Insurance Company Notice of Pendency of Other Actions (Ray, Amy)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - Track 2 (MSS)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Progressive Express Insurance Company.(Ray, Amy)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING Civil Cover Sheet filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company.(Ray, Amy) Modified text on 5/22/2019 (BSN).
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Susan C. Bucklew and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1246-T-24AEP. (SJB)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hillsborough County, case number 19-ca-3812 filed in State Court on 4/11/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15487298 filed by Progressive Express Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Ray, Amy) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/21/2019: #6 STATE COURT COMPLAINT) (BSN). COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO FILE FEDERAL CIVIL COVER SHEET.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krpic v. Progressive Express Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Branko Krpic
Represented By: Danko Borkovic
Represented By: Benjamin L. Crawford
Represented By: Stephen A. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Represented By: Amy Ray
Represented By: Erin M. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?