Washington v. The Bancorp Bank

Plaintiff: Sharika Michelle Washington
Defendant: The Bancorp Bank
Case Number: 8:2019cv01256
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
2 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 5 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:19-cv1256-T-60AAS. Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich no longer assigned to the case. (AET)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 5/23/2019. (SRC)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to The Bancorp Bank. (LNR)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Bancorp Bank with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA56671 filed by Sharika Michelle Washington. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(LNR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Washington v. The Bancorp Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharika Michelle Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bancorp Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?