Gracy v. Minawi

Plaintiff: G. Andrew Gracy
Defendant: Bassam Minawi
Case Number: 8:2019cv01258
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER denying #4 Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency; overruling #11 objections; adopting #6 Report and Recommendations; denying as moot #10 Motion to Remand to State Court; and directing Clerk to remand case and thereafter to close case in accord with the attached order. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 7/2/2019. (CCB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 11 OBJECTION to #6 Report and Recommendations by Bassam Minawi. (BES)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to remand to State Court and Supporting Memorandum of Law by G. Andrew Gracy. (Jammo, Caitlein)
June 21, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice by G. Andrew Gracy identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel & Burns, LLP, Corporate Parent Peebles & Gracy, P.A., Corporate Parent Brandon Bellew, Other Affiliate G. Andrew Gracy, Other Affiliate Bassam Minawi, Other Affiliate Caitlein J. Jammo, Other Affiliate Nasseem Akhtar Bashir for G. Andrew Gracy. (Jammo, Caitlein)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Bassam Minawi. (BES)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bassam Minawi. Related case(s): yes (BES)
June 12, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #4 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency filed by Bassam Minawi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 6/12/2019. (VIV)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Bassam Minawi. Related case(s): yes (BES) Modified on 6/12/2019 corrected filing party (BES).
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis/affidavit of indigency by Bassam Minawi. (BES) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Compliance with re #1 Notice of Removal by Bassam Minawi (BES)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/27/2019. (SAO)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pinellas County, case number 16-004058-CI filed in State Court on 06/17/16. filed by Bassam Minawi. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Other Documents, #3 State Court ANSWER)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gracy v. Minawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bassam Minawi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G. Andrew Gracy
Represented By: Brandon D. Bellew
Represented By: Caitlein Jayne Jammo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?