RBD Technologies, LLC v. Adams Arms, LLC et al

Plaintiff: RBD TECHNOLOGIES LLC and RBD Technologies, LLC
Defendant: ADAMS ARMS LLC, Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms Holdings LLC and Adams Arms, LLC
Not Yet Classified: James Matulis
Case Number: 8:2019cv01262
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 35 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Adams Arms Holdings LLC, Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC.(Fee, Richard)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER appointing James Matulis as mediator in this action. The mediation conference is scheduled for November 8, 2019, at 9:30 AM. The Court directs that all counsel, parties, corporate representatives, and any other required claims professionals shall be present at the mediation conference with full authority to negotiate a settlement. The Court does not allow mediation by telephone or video conference. Personal attendance is required. See Local Rule 9.05(c). Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/11/2019. (DMD)
July 10, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on 11/8/2019 at 9:30 am before James Matulis. (Conwell, George)
July 9, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #28 Case management and scheduling order by Adams Arms Holdings LLC, Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC. (Fee, Richard)
July 8, 2019 Filing 31 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1262-T-33AAS. (JNB)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER of recusal. Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson recused. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/5/2019. (DMS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by RBD Technologies, LLC. (Conwell, George)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 11/8/2019. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/3/2019. (TWL)
July 2, 2019 Filing 27 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 7/2/2019. Court Reporter: Scott N. Gamertsfelder (TWL)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORAL ORDER extending all Defendants' deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint to July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/2/2019. (DMD)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 defendants' Unopposed Motion to Withdraw. Attorney John Todd Timmerman terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/27/2019. (DMS)
June 27, 2019 Filing 24 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Conwell, George)
June 26, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for J. Todd Timmerman to withdraw as attorney by Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC. (Timmerman, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 26, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen M. Wade on behalf of Adams Arms Holdings LLC, Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC (Wade, Kathleen)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Edson Fee on behalf of Adams Arms Holdings LLC, Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC (Fee, Richard)
June 25, 2019 Filing 20 RETURN of service executed on 06/24/2019 by RBD Technologies, LLC as to Adams Arms Holdings LLC. (Conwell, George)
June 24, 2019 Filing 19 SUMMONS issued as to Adams Arms Holdings LLC. (BES)
June 21, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Adams Arms Holdings LLC with Jury Demand. filed by RBD Technologies, LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint filed by RBD Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Adams Arms Holdings LLC)(Conwell, George)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting the unopposed motion for extension of time to file answer. (Doc. #16). Defendants' answers are now due July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/19/2019. (DMD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC. (Timmerman, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of hearing: Case Management Hearing set for July 2, 2019, at 3:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 14 B before Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington. Absent compelling circumstances and leave of Court, Lead Counsel must appear in person at the Case Management Hearing. Lead Counsel must be prepared to discuss the claims and defenses as well as any unique aspects of the case with the Court. This hearing is an investment of the Court's time and presents an opportunity for Counsel to meet the judge presiding over their case as well as present any issues that should be called to the Court's attention.(TWL)
June 18, 2019 Filing 14 RETURN of service executed on 05/30/2019 by RBD Technologies, LLC as to Adams Arms, Inc. (BES)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 RETURN of service executed on 05/30/2019 by RBD Technologies, LLC as to Adams Arms, LLC. (BES)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ENDORSED ORDER: The Clerk is directed to schedule this case for a Case Management Hearing on July 2, 2019. The parties are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by June 28, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report for patent cases. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. The parties should come to the Case Management Hearing prepared to discuss all issues in the case. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/18/2019. (DMD)
June 18, 2019 Filing 11 PROOF of service by RBD Technologies, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Return of Service re Adams Arms LLC, #2 Exhibit B- Return of Service re Adams Arms Inc.)(Conwell, George)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to file a status report on its efforts to perfect service of process on Defendants by June 24, 2019. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 6/17/2019. (DMD)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Order, #5 Related case order and track 2 notice, #8 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by RBD Technologies, LLC. Related case(s): no (Conwell, George)
May 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Vivek Ganti, appearing on behalf of RBD Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056764.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Steven G. Hill and Vivek A. Ganti to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
May 31, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Steven G. Hill, appearing on behalf of RBD Technologies, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056764.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Steven G. Hill and Vivek A. Ganti to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 plaintiff's Motion for Steven G. Hill and Vivek Ganti to appear pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 5/29/2019. (DMS)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Steven G. Hill and Vivek A. Ganti to appear pro hac vice by RBD Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Good Standing Steven G. Hill, #2 Exhibit B - Letter of Good Standing Vivek A. Ganti)(Conwell, George) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL)
May 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/27/2019. (TWL)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Adams Arms, Inc., Adams Arms, LLC. (BES)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1262-T-33TGW. (SJB)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15495673) filed by RBD TECHNOLOGIES LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Patent No. US 6848351, #2 Exhibit B - Patent No. US 7827722, #3 Exhibit C - Patent No. US 9322609, #4 Exhibit D - Patent No. US 8297175, #5 Exhibit E - Patent No. US 8707850, #6 Exhibit F - Website, #7 Exhibit G - Owners Manual-Adams Arms, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Proposed Summons Adams Arms LLC, #10 Proposed Summons Adams Arms Inc.)(Conwell, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RBD Technologies, LLC v. Adams Arms, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBD TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Represented By: George Donovan Conwell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RBD Technologies, LLC
Represented By: George Donovan Conwell, Jr.
Represented By: Steven G. Hill
Represented By: Vivek Ganti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADAMS ARMS LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Arms, Inc.
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Represented By: John Todd Timmerman
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Arms Holdings LLC
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams Arms, LLC
Represented By: Richard Edson Fee
Represented By: John Todd Timmerman
Represented By: Kathleen M. Wade
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: James Matulis
Represented By: James Michael Matulis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?