Rodriguez v. OfferUp,Inc. et al

Plaintiff: David Rodriguez
Defendant: OfferUp,Inc. and John Doe
Case Number: 8:2019cv01290
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: James S Moody
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 36 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by OfferUp,Inc.. (Lake, James)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ENDORSED ORDER granting #34 Defendant OfferUp Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant OfferUp Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/24/2019. (SMB)
July 23, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for leave to file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response to Defendant Offerup Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss by OfferUp,Inc.. (Lake, James)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #31 Motion to Amend/Correct; denying without prejudice #31 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Motion fails to include a sufficient Memorandum of Law. Specifically, a request to amend a complaint after removal (that would destroy subject matter jurisdiction) must be analyzed under 28 U.S.C. 1447(e). Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr on 7/23/2019. (JG)
July 22, 2019 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by David Rodriguez. (Espat, Karim)
July 22, 2019 Filing 31 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint to Add Non-Diverse Parties, MOTION to remand to State Court and Memorandum of Law by David Rodriguez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint)(Espat, Karim)
July 22, 2019 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by OfferUp,Inc.. (Lake, James)
July 19, 2019 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law filed by David Rodriguez. (Espat, Karim)
July 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nicholas B. Gorga (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057261.) Related document: #23 Unopposed MOTION for Nicholas B. Gorga to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 11, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Shirin G. Goyal (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057261.) Related document: #24 Unopposed MOTION for Shirin S. Goyal to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ENDORSED ORDER granting #27 Joint Motion to Stay Discovery pending the resolution of OfferUp's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (SMB)
July 11, 2019 Filing 27 Joint MOTION to stay discovery and Supporting Memorandum of Law by OfferUp,Inc. (Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ENDORSED ORDER granting #24 Unopposed Motion for Shirin S. Goyal to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (SMB)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Unopposed Motion for Nicholas B. Gorga to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/11/2019. (SMB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Shirin S. Goyal to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Nicholas B. Gorga to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 8, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Supporting Memorandum of Law by OfferUp,Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Lake, James)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ENDORSED ORDER granting #19 Jonathan P. Reinisch's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for OfferUp, Inc. (Attorney Jonathon P. Reinisch terminated.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (SMB)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ENDORSED ORDER granting #18 Blaine C. Kimrey's Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for OfferUp, Inc. (Attorney Blaine C. Kimrey terminated.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (SMB)
July 3, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Mohamed Awan, appearing on behalf of OfferUp,Inc. (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057168.) Related document: #16 Unopposed MOTION for Mohamed Awan to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
July 3, 2019 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for to withdraw as attorney by OfferUp,Inc.. (Philipson, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 3, 2019 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Blaine C. Kimrey to withdraw as attorney by OfferUp,Inc.. (Philipson, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Motion for Mohamed Awan to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp, Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 7/3/2019. (SMB)
July 2, 2019 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Mohamed Awan to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Philipson, Jon) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Michael Philipson on behalf of OfferUp,Inc. (Philipson, Jon)
June 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of compliance by OfferUp,Inc. (Lake, James)
June 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by David Rodriguez. Related case(s): no (Espat, Karim)
June 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #4 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by OfferUp,Inc.. Related case(s): No (Lake, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Karim Mitch Espat on behalf of David Rodriguez (Espat, Karim)
June 7, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Jonathon P. Reinisch (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056867.) Related document: #8 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathon P. Reinisch to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
June 7, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Blaine C. Kimrey (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA056867.) Related document: #7 Unopposed MOTION for Blaine C. Kimrey to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Unopposed Motion for Jonathon P. Reinisch to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/7/2019. (SMB)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Motion for Blaine C. Kimrey to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/7/2019. (SMB)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Jonathon P. Reinisch to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Blaine C. Kimrey to appear pro hac vice by OfferUp,Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lake, James) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 Defendant OfferUp, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead. Defendant's answer or response is due by July 8, 2019. Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 6/4/2019. (SMB)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Plead by OfferUp,Inc.. (Lake, James)
May 31, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Issued by Deputy Clerk on 5/31/2019. (KAC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE to counsel Blaine C. Kimrey & Jonathon P. Reinisch of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (LSS)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge James S. Moody, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1290-T-30SPF. (SJB)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed in State Court on 4/4/2019. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15518029 filed by OfferUp,Inc.. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lake, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. OfferUp,Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OfferUp,Inc.
Represented By: James B. Lake
Represented By: Mohamed M. Awan
Represented By: Jon Michael Philipson
Represented By: Jonathon P. Reinisch
Represented By: Nicholas B. Gorga
Represented By: Blaine C. Kimrey
Represented By: Shirin S. Goyal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Rodriguez
Represented By: Karim Mitch Espat
Represented By: Matthew D. Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?