Robles v. Geico Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Linda J. Robles
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01293
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
2 Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2019; Discovery due by 4/15/2020; Dispositive motions due by 5/15/2020; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 2/14/2020; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 3/13/2020; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Tampa Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. Trial set for term commencing 10/5/2020 before Judge Thomas P. Barber. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 4-5 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 4/22/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/26/2019. (SRC)
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie Alice Weeks on behalf of Linda J. Robles (Weeks, Stephanie)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:19-cv-1293-T-60AAS. Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich no longer assigned to the case. (AET)
July 17, 2019 Filing 14 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Alexander, Megan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Linda J. Robles. Related case(s): yes (Marino, Stephen)
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Linda J. Robles. (Marino, Stephen)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ENDORSED ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Telephonically. The Parties may appear by telephone at the case management conference for the purpose of filing their joint Case Management Report. In the event that the parties fail to agree upon necessary terms of the Case Management Report, the court may direct that they conduct a second conference in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone on 6/25/2019. (BEE)
June 25, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically for the Case Management Conference by Linda J. Robles. (Marino, Stephen) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone.
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Geico Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation for Geico Indemnity Company. (Angley, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Geico Indemnity Company. Related case(s): NO (Angley, David)
June 24, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Geico Indemnity Company.(Alexander, Megan)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN of service executed on 6/4/19 by Linda J. Robles as to Geico Indemnity Company. (Marino, Stephen)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 5/30/2019. (SRC)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Geico Indemnity Company. (LNR)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 7/15/2008. (LNR)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1293-T-17AAS. (SJB)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geico Indemnity Company with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15517374) filed by Linda J. Robles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certified Policy, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Marino, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robles v. Geico Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda J. Robles
Represented By: Stephen A. Marino, Jr.
Represented By: Stephanie Alice Weeks
Represented By: Michal Meiler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Indemnity Company
Represented By: Megan Alexander
Represented By: David Michael Angley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?