United States of America v. Approximately $35,097.00 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Hi-Point, Model CF380, A Brown 2015 Mercedes-Benz CLA45, Approximately $35,097.00 and A Brown 2015 Mercedes-Benz S550
Case Number: 8:2019cv01295
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: William F Jung
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 PROOF of publication filed by United States of America. Newspaper: Official Government Internet Site (www.forfeiture.gov) Date(s) of publication 30 consecutive days from June 12, 2019 through July 11, 2019. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Warrant In Rem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 6/13/2019. (DMS)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by United States of America. Related case(s): yes (Nebesky, Suzanne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice by United States of America identifying Corporate Parent Ally Financial Inc. for United States of America. (Nebesky, Suzanne)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Nebesky, Suzanne) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against A Brown 2015 Mercedes-Benz S550, Approximately $35,097.00, Hi-Point, Model CF380 filed by United States of America.(Nebesky, Suzanne) Modified on 6/12/2019 (BES).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Counsel and any unrepresented party shall meet within sixty days after service of the complaint upon any defendant for the purpose of preparing and filing a Case Management Report. Signed by Judge William F. Jung on 5/31/2019. (SAO)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Approximately $35,097.00, A Brown 2015 Mercedes-Benz CLA45, Hi-Point, Model CF380 filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(BES)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $35,097.00 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hi-Point, Model CF380
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Brown 2015 Mercedes-Benz CLA45
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $35,097.00
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Brown 2015 Mercedes-Benz S550
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Suzanne C. Nebesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?