Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Martineau et al
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co., GEICO Casualty Co. and GEICO General Insurance Company
Defendant: Sean Martineau and Shazam Auto Glass LLC
Case Number: 8:2019cv01382
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ENDORSED ORDER DENYING AS MOOT #16 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. In light of Plaintiffs' having filed an Amended Complaint as a matter of course, Defendants' motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendants shall be free to reassert any of the challenges raised therein to the extent that they remain viable against the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 8/2/2019. (APF)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Sean Martineau, Shazam Auto Glass LLC with Jury Demand. filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Indemnity Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Exhibit to Amended Complaint)(Marino, John) Modified text on 8/2/2019 (AG).
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. (Levine, Howard)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #3 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Sean Martineau, Shazam Auto Glass LLC. Related case(s): yes (Laurato, Michael) Modified text on 7/19/2019 (LNR).
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by Sean Martineau. (Laurato, Michael)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER GRANTING #10 Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint. Defendants shall have up to and including July 19, 2019 to file their answers or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/17/2019. (APF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of compliance re 8 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Vincent Laurato on behalf of Sean Martineau, Shazam Auto Glass LLC. (Laurato, Michael)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint by All Defendants. (Levine, Howard)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Howard Jerome Levine on behalf of Sean Martineau and Shazam Auto Glass LLC .(Levine, Howard) Modified text on 6/25/2019 (LNR).
June 21, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Yonatan Bernstein (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057041.) Related document: #7 MOTION for Yonatan Bernstein to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Yonatan Bernstein may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiffs, with Attorney John P. Marino designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 6/19/2019. (CKR)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Yonatan Bernstein to appear pro hac vice by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Pro Hac Vice of Yonatan Bernstein, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Marino, John) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Interested persons order by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway, Inc. for GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. (Marino, John)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO General Insurance Company, GEICO Indemnity Co., Government Employees Insurance Co. Related case(s): no (Marino, John)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2019. (KTT)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2019. (KTT)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS issued as to Sean Martineau, Shazam Auto Glass LLC. (KKH)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sean Martineau, Shazam Auto Glass LLC with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number JAX030993 filed by GEICO General Insurance Company, Government Employees Insurance Co., GEICO Casualty Co., GEICO Indemnity Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KKH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Government Employees Insurance Co. et al v. Martineau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sean Martineau
Represented By: Michael Vincent Laurato
Represented By: Howard Jerome Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shazam Auto Glass LLC
Represented By: Michael Vincent Laurato
Represented By: Howard Jerome Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Government Employees Insurance Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Indemnity Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO Casualty Co.
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEICO General Insurance Company
Represented By: John Patrick Marino
Represented By: Yonatan Bernstein
Represented By: Lindsey R. Trowell
Represented By: Kristen Wenger Bracken
Represented By: Yonatan M. Bernstein
Represented By: Kristen Lindsay Wenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?