Upshur v. Duke Energy
Plaintiff: McKenzie Upshur
Defendant: Duke Energy
Case Number: 8:2019cv01391
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Amanda Arnold Sansone
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 8/2/2019 by McKenzie Upshur as to Duke Energy. (Johnson, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #5 Interested persons order by McKenzie Upshur. (Johnson, Thomas)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by McKenzie Upshur. Related case(s): Yes (Johnson, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2019. (KTT)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 6/24/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 6/10/2019. (KTT)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Duke Energy. (LNR)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1391-T-35AAS. (SJB)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Duke Energy with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15553876) filed by McKenzie Upshur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Exhibit)(Johnson, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upshur v. Duke Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: McKenzie Upshur
Represented By: Thomas Loraine Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?