Krutzler et al v. McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wolfgang Krutzler and Virginia Alane Rogers
Defendant: McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01506
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
2 Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ENDORSED ORDER granting Plaintiffs' "Motion to Remand" (Doc. #11). In light of Defendant's response agreeing to the motion (Doc. #15), the Court finds that remand to state court is proper. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/12/2019. (ANL)
August 5, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to remand to State Court filed by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Allaman, Melissa)
August 1, 2019 Filing 14 STRICKEN. NOTICE of compliance Rule 26(a) Disclosures by Wolfgang Krutzler, Virginia Alane Rogers (Greene, Theodore) NOTE: STRICKEN, PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 3.03 - DISCOVERY, NOTICE ATTACHED, COUNSEL NOTIFIED. Modified on 8/2/2019 (LD). (LD).
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings/Joinder of Parties due by 12/9/2019; Discovery due by 7/27/2020; Dispositive motions due by 8/25/2020; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 10/7/2019; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 11/7/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 02:00 PM in Tampa Courtroom 11A before Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. Trial set for term commencing 2/1/2021 before Judge Thomas P. Barber. The parties anticipate a JURY TRIAL will take 3-4 days to complete. Conduct mediation hearing by 8/27/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/31/2019. (SRC)
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Allaman, Melissa)
July 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to remand to State Court by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Complaint Filed in State Court)(Greene, Theodore)
July 18, 2019 Filing 10 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:19-cv-1506-T-60JSS. Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich no longer assigned to the case. (AET)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #7 Defendant McLaren Automotive Inc.'s Motion for Telephonic Meet and Conferral by Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/1/2019. (JAR)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc.'s ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Krutzler and Rogers by McLaren Automotive, Inc..(Allaman, Melissa)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Telephonically by all counsel to meet and confer by McLaren Automotive, Inc.. (Allaman, Melissa) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Initial Appearance by Theodore F. Greene, III on behalf of Wolfgang Krutzler (Greene, Theodore)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2019. (SRC)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by McLaren Automotive, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent McLaren Finance plc for McLaren Automotive, Inc... (Allaman, Melissa)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/2008. (JCG)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1506-T-17JSS. (SJB)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sarasota County Florida Circuit Court, case number 2019-CA-002677NC filed in State Court on 05/16/19. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 113A-15606328 filed by McLaren Automotive, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court COMPLAINT, #2 Exhibit Service of Process Confirmation for Service on Defendant McLaren Automotive, Inc., #3 Exhibit Purchase Contract, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allaman, Melissa) Modified text on 6/24/2019 (JCG).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krutzler et al v. McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLaren Automotive, Inc.
Represented By: Melissa Fletcher Allaman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolfgang Krutzler
Represented By: Kevin Carey
Represented By: Theodore F. Greene, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Alane Rogers
Represented By: Kevin Carey
Represented By: Theodore F. Greene, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?