Simon v. Coca-Cola Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Simon
Defendant: Coca-Cola Company
Case Number: 8:2019cv01519
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Referring Judge: Christopher P Tuite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of service by Kimberly Simon re #13 Response to motion. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope)(CTR)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law filed by Kimberly Simon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(CTR)
August 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Nathan J. Allen, appearing on behalf of Coca-Cola Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057594.) Related document: #8 MOTION for Nathan J. Allen to appear pro hac vice. (AG)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Coca-Cola Company re #7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Generotti, Stephanie)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kimberly Simon. Related case(s): no (CTR)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Kimberly Simon. (CTR)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ENDORSED ORDER granting #8 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan J. Allen. If counsel has not already done so, within 14 days hereof, he shall pay the $150 fee to the Clerk of Court and complete the e-filer registration form (available at http://www.flmd.uscourts.gov/special-admission-practice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 8/1/2019. (AMM)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Nathan J. Allen to appear pro hac vice by Coca-Cola Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Generotti, Stephanie) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite.
July 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Coca-Cola Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 *** per counsel corrected image of Exhibit 3 will be filed separately *** )(Generotti, Stephanie) Modified text on 7/31/2019 (KMM).
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #3 Interested persons order by Kimberly Simon. (CTR)
July 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #2 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Kimberly Simon. Related case(s): no (CTR)
July 5, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to Coca-Cola Company. (CTR)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/1/2019. (BGS)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/1/2019. (BGS)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Coca-Cola Company with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 400, receipt number TPA057129 filed by Kimberly Simon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(CTR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simon v. Coca-Cola Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coca-Cola Company
Represented By: Nathan J. Allen
Represented By: Stephanie Generotti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Simon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?