Lemay v. Associa Gulf Coast, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Marybeth Lemay
Defendant: WATERSIDE AT COQUINA KEY SOUTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC., ASSOCIA GULF COAST INC. and Associa Gulf Coast, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01525
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Kovachevich
2 Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to extend time until September 19, 2019, to respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 8/21/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to extend time to RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by Marybeth Lemay. (Rojas-Colucci, Candice) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
August 5, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint for Forum Non Conveniens or In the Alternative, MOTION to transfer case by Associa Gulf Coast, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michelle Burnside)(De Leon, Jacqueline)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant Waterside at Coquina Key South Condominium Association, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (Doc. #8). Waterside's response to the Complaint is due by August 26, 2019. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 7/24/2019. (DLB)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or respond. Associa Gulf Coast, Inc. answer or response due 8/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 7/23/2019. (Wilson, Thomas)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Waterside at Coquina Key South Condominium Association, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter)(Andrews, Nicholas)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Associa Gulf Coast, Inc.. (De Leon, Jacqueline) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson.
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:19-cv-1525-T-60TGW. Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich no longer assigned to the case. (AET)
June 25, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 6/25/2019. (SRC)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/2008. (LD)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Associa Gulf Coast, Inc. (LD)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1525-T-17TGW. (SJB)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Associa Gulf Coast, Inc., Waterside at Coquina Key South Condominium Association, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15612352) filed by Marybeth Lemay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Proposed Summons)(Rojas-Colucci, Candice) Modified on 6/25/2019 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemay v. Associa Gulf Coast, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WATERSIDE AT COQUINA KEY SOUTH CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION, INC.
Represented By: Nicholas S. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASSOCIA GULF COAST INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associa Gulf Coast, Inc.
Represented By: Jacqueline M. De Leon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marybeth Lemay
Represented By: Candice Amber Rojas-Colucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?