Harter et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: RONALD HARTER and JULIA HARTER
Defendant: THETFORD CORPORATION, NORCOLD, INC., THEDYSON-KISSNER-MORAN CORPORATION and The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Case Number: 8:2019cv01547
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Sean P Flynn
Referring Judge: Charlene Edwards Honeywell
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer is due 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 8/6/2019. (NCR)
August 6, 2019 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Plankey, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
August 6, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott William Plankey on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation (Plankey, Scott)
August 6, 2019 Filing 21 ***TERMINATED--COUNSEL ON SIGNATURE LINE DOES NOT MATCH COUNSEL OF ENTRY--COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE***Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #12 Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Plankey, Scott) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. Modified on 8/6/2019 (CTR).
August 6, 2019 Filing 20 ***TERMINATED--COUNSEL ON SIGNATURE LINE DOES NOT MATCH COUNSEL OF ENTRY--COUNSEL NOTIFIED TO RE-FILE***NOTICE of Appearance by Scott William Plankey on behalf of Norcold, Inc., The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation (Plankey, Scott) Modified on 8/6/2019 (CTR).
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2019 by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter as to Thetford Corporation. (Kaye, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 18 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2019 by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter as to The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. (Kaye, Joseph)
July 17, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 07/16/2019 by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter as to Norcold, Inc.. (Kaye, Joseph) Modified text only on 7/17/2019 (CTR).
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter. (Kaye, Joseph)
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter. Related case(s): yes (Kaye, Joseph)
July 5, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Terrance A. Beard, appearing on behalf of Julia Harter, Ronald Harter (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057195.) Related document: #13 MOTION for Terrence A. Beard to appear pro hac vice. (JCG)
July 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Terrence Beard may appear pro hac vice on behalf of the Plaintiffs, with Attorney Joseph M. Kaye designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Please note that a local attorney must be present for any evidentiary hearing before the district judge and during trial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn on 7/5/2019. (NCR)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Terrence A. Beard to appear pro hac vice by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DECLARATION OF TERRENCE A. BEARD, #2 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER)(Kaye, Joseph) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn.
July 1, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand. filed by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Kaye, Joseph)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/1/2019. (BGS)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 7/1/2019. (BGS)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice as a shotgun pleading. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an Amended Complaint within FOURTEEN (14) DAYS of the date of this Order. The Amended Complaint shall cure the deficiencies identified in this Order as to a shotgun pleading and in the allegations regarding the parties' citizenship so as to sufficiently allege subject matter jurisdiction. Failure to file an Amended Complaint that sufficiently alleges subject matter jurisdiction within the time provided will result in dismissal of this action without further notice. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/28/2019. (LJB)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 motion to amend/correct. The caption of this case is hereby corrected to reflect the correct name of Defendant The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. The Clerk of Court is directed to edit the caption of the case to reflect Defendant's correct name. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/28/2019. (LJB)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ENDORSED ORDER granting #6 motion to amend/correct. The caption of this case is hereby corrected to reflect the correct name of Defendant The Dysin-Kissner-Moran Corporation. The Clerk of Court is directed to edit the caption of the case to reflect Defendant's correct name.Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 6/28/2019. (CEH)
June 27, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Julia Harter, Ronald Harter. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A)(Kaye, Joseph)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.02 (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE to counsel of Local Rule 2.01 (signed by deputy clerk). (CTR)
June 27, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Norcold, Inc., Thedyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Thetford Corporation. (CTR)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Sean P. Flynn. New case number: 8:19-cv-1547-T-36SPF. (SJB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15623439) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons NORCOLD, INC, #9 Proposed Summons THETFORD CORPORATION, #10 Proposed Summons THEDYSON-KISSNER-MORAN CORPORATION,)(Kaye, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harter et al v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RONALD HARTER
Represented By: Joseph Kaye
Represented By: Terrence A. Beard
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JULIA HARTER
Represented By: Joseph Kaye
Represented By: Terrence A. Beard
Represented By: Adam M. Moskowitz
Represented By: Howard Mitchell Bushman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THETFORD CORPORATION
Represented By: Scott William Plankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORCOLD, INC.
Represented By: Scott William Plankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THEDYSON-KISSNER-MORAN CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Represented By: Scott William Plankey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?