Riley v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Plaintiff: Glenn Riley
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01549
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Thomas P Barber
Referring Judge: Thomas G Wilson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 Case Reassigned to Judge Thomas P. Barber. New case number: 8:19-cv-1549-T-60TGW. Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich no longer assigned to the case. (AET)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER of service returned executed on 7/9/19 by Glenn Riley as to G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.. (Salzer, Abby)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Glenn Riley. Related case(s): No (Salzer, Abby)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich on 07/15/2008. (LD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued as to G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. (LD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2 issued by Deputy Clerk on 6/28/2019. (SRC)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Glenn Riley. (LD)
June 27, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Elizabeth A. Kovachevich and Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. New case number: 8:19-cv-1549-T-17TGW. (SJB)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15624746) filed by Glenn Riley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Certificate of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Salzer, Abby)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riley v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn Riley
Represented By: Abby Dritz Salzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?