EW IP Reserve, LLC v. Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.

Plaintiff: EW IP Reserve, LLC
Defendant: Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.
Case Number: 8:2019cv01620
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Anthony E Porcelli
Referring Judge: Mary S Scriven
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of compliance Regarding Admission of Stephen H. Bean by EW IP Reserve, LLC (Attachments: #1 State Court Other Documents Certificate of Good Standing)(Bean, Stephen)
August 5, 2019 Filing 18 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint by Johnny's Egg Works, Inc..(Eddy, Robert)
August 1, 2019 Filing 17 RETURN of service executed on 7/19/2019 by EW IP Reserve, LLC as to Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of service)(Bean, Stephen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 16 TERMINATED. PROOF of service by EW IP Reserve, LLC (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of process server)(Bean, Stephen) NOTE: Incorrect event code; counsel notified to re-file selecting: Summons returned executed/un-executed. Modified on 8/1/2019 (LD).
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by EW IP Reserve, LLC. Related case(s): no (Bean, Stephen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by EW IP Reserve, LLC. (Bean, Stephen)
July 31, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order Amended by Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.. (Eddy, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 TERMIANTED. NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Eddy, Robert) NOTE: DUPLICATE ENTRY SAME AS DKT. 11; COUNSEL NOTIFIED. Modified on 7/25/2019 (LD).
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #7 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.. Related case(s): no (Eddy, Robert)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #8 Interested persons order by Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.. (Eddy, Robert)
July 23, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Stephen H. Bean (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA07473.) Related document: #5 MOTION for Stephen Bean to appear pro hac vice. (ARC)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert K. Eddy on behalf of Johnny's Egg Works, Inc. (Eddy, Robert)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/19/2019. (KTT)
July 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 8/2/2019. Signed by Judge Mary S. Scriven on 7/19/2019. (KTT)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER granting #5 motion to appear pro hac vice. Attorney Stephen Bean may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff, with Attorney Woodrow H. Pollack designated as local counsel pursuant to Local Rule 2.02(a). Within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, counsel shall comply with the fee and electronic filing requirements and file a notice of compliance with said requirements. Signed by Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli on 7/18/2019. (VIV)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Stephen Bean to appear pro hac vice by EW IP Reserve, LLC. (Pollack, Woodrow) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli.
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 Trademark Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (LD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Johnny's Egg Works, Inc. (LD)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Mary S. Scriven and Magistrate Judge Anthony E. Porcelli. New case number: 8:19-cv-1620-T-35AEP. (SJB)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnny's Egg Works, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15650583) filed by EW IP Reserve, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Pollack, Woodrow) Modified on 7/3/2019 (LD).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EW IP Reserve, LLC v. Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EW IP Reserve, LLC
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Represented By: Stephen Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnny's Egg Works, Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?