Health in Motion LLC et al v. Euro Shine U.S.A., INC.
Plaintiff: Dream Visions, LLC and Health in Motion, LLC
Defendant: Euro Shine U.S.A., Inc
Not Yet Classified: Peter J. Grilli
Case Number: 8:2019cv01662
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Virginia M Hernandez Covington
Referring Judge: Julie S Sneed
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Conduct mediation hearing by 3/13/2020. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 8/20/2019. (TWL)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Babcock, Brenton)
August 15, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Dream Visions, LLC, Health in Motion, LLC. (Babcock, Brenton)
August 14, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Euro Shine U.S.A., Inc. (Gilchrist, Brian)
August 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Dream Visions, LLC, Health in Motion, LLC. Related case(s): No (Babcock, Brenton)
August 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Service of Related Case Order and Track Two Notice by Dream Visions, LLC, Health in Motion, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Babcock, Brenton)
August 7, 2019 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Brenton R. Babcock, appearing on behalf of Health in Motion, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number TPA057646.) Related document: #8MOTION for Brenton R Babcock to appear pro hac vice. (WCD)
July 31, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Euro Shine U.S.A., Inc.(Gilchrist, Brian)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/29/2019. (TWL)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 the Motion to Admit Brenton R. Babcock Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/24/2019. (JAR)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Plaintiffs' Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed on 7/24/2019. (JAR)
July 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Brenton R Babcock to appear pro hac vice by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Pollack, Woodrow) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
July 23, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Substitute Attorney by All Plaintiffs. (Pollack, Woodrow) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed.
July 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER: Counsel are directed to meet and confer, in person or by telephone, and by August 15, 2019, file a completed Case Management Report for patent cases. This document can be found on Judge Covington's page of the Court's website at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. Please be advised that the Court's Case Management Report form is different from those used by other judges. Local Rule 3.05(c)(2)(E), M.D. Fla., explains that most track two cases, like the present case, "will be tried within one year after the filing of the complaint." To accomplish this goal, the Court believes that six to eight months is a sufficient period of time to conduct discovery. If the parties believe that more time than eight months will be needed to complete discovery, the parties should provide the Court with a detailed explanation as to why additional time is needed and a timeline for the discovery that is planned. The Court will then determine whether a Case Management Hearing is necessary before entry of a Case Management and Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/16/2019. (DMD)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 RETURN of service executed on 7/11/19 by Health in Motion, LLC, Dream Visions, LLC as to All Defendants. (Larson, Herbert)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (BES)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued as to Euro Shine U.S.A., Inc. (BES)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:19-cv-1662-T-33JSS. (SJB)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15668627) filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Larson, H.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Health in Motion LLC et al v. Euro Shine U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Euro Shine U.S.A., Inc
Represented By: Brian R. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dream Visions, LLC
Represented By: Herbert W Larson
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Represented By: Brenton R. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Health in Motion, LLC
Represented By: Herbert W Larson
Represented By: Woodrow Heath Pollack
Represented By: Brenton R. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Peter J. Grilli
Represented By: Peter John Grilli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?